Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2025729

EP2025729 - Tear proof adhesive tape [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.08.2012
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
tesa SE
Hugo-Kirchberg-Strasse 1
22848 Norderstedt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/20]For all designated states
tesa SE
Quickbornstrasse 24
20253 Hamburg / DE
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
tesa AG
Quickbornstrasse 24
20253 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Rodewald, Ilse
4913 Cameron Valley Parkway
Charlotte, NC 28210 / US
02 / Latz, Dr. Henning
Rehhagen 19
21337, Lüneburg / DE
03 / Yun, Petra
Ernst-Thälmann-Platz 1
20251, Hamburg / DE
 [2011/40]
Former [2009/08]01 / Rodewald, Ilse
Högenstrasse 24
22527, Hamburg / DE
02 / Latz, Dr. Henning
Igelweg 19
21337, Lüneburg / DE
03 / Yun, Petra
Martinistr. 16
20251, Hamburg / DE
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2011/41]
Application number, filing date08159839.307.07.2008
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateDE2007103513025.07.2007         Original published format: DE102007035130
[2009/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2025729
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2025729
Date:12.10.2011
Language:DE
[2011/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:C09J7/02
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
TitleGerman:Weiterreissfestes Klebeband[2009/08]
English:Tear proof adhesive tape[2009/08]
French:Bande adhésive protégé contre la déchirure[2009/08]
Examination procedure18.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/39]
14.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.12.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.08.2011Fee for grant paid
26.08.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.09.2009
Opposition(s)13.07.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
01.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.07.2008
CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
FI12.10.2011
HR12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
MT12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
TR12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
NO12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
ES23.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
LU07.07.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
FI12.10.2011
HR12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
MT12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
TR12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
NO12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
ES23.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
LU07.07.2012
Former [2014/21]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
FI12.10.2011
HR12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
MT12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
TR12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
NO12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
ES23.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2013/35]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
FI12.10.2011
HR12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
MT12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
NO12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
ES23.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2013/29]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
FI12.10.2011
HR12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
NO12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
ES23.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2013/22]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
HR12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
NO12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
ES23.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/37]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
HR12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
NO12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/36]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
HR12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
NO12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/35]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
HR12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
NO12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/34]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
HR12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
NO12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/28]CY12.10.2011
HR12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
NO12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/27]HR12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
NO12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/24]LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
NO12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/23]LT12.10.2011
NO12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/21]LT12.10.2011
NO12.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
Former [2012/20]LT12.10.2011
NO12.01.2012
Documents cited:Search[PXA]EP1813659  (TESA AG [DE]) [PX] 1,3-11 * the whole document * [PA] 2
by applicantDE19955610
 EP0411820
 EP0343896
 US5145544
 US5173141
 EP1775331
 DE4313008
 US2750315