Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023291

EP2023291 - Motion detection method and device with algorithm for thresholding by casing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.07.2015
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip31.07.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.09.2015  [2015/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives
Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc
75015 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2010/18]For all designated states
Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives
Bâtiment D "Le Ponant" 25, rue Leblanc
75015 Paris / FR
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique
25, rue Leblanc Bâtiment "Le Ponant D"
75015 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Verdant, Arnaud
24, rue de l'Hôtel de Ville
38110 La Tour du Pin / FR
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Ilgart, Jean-Christophe
BREVALEX
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Ilgart, Jean-Christophe
BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date08160433.215.07.2008
[2009/07]
Priority number, dateFR2007005651716.07.2007         Original published format: FR 0756517
[2009/07]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2023291
Date:11.02.2009
Language:FR
[2009/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2023291
Date:12.08.2009
[2009/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.07.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06T7/20
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bewegungserfassung mit Hilfe des Schwellenalgorithmus mit Hülle[2009/07]
English:Motion detection method and device with algorithm for thresholding by casing[2009/07]
French:Procédé et dispositif de détection de mouvement à algorithme de seuillage par enveloppe[2009/07]
Examination procedure05.02.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.02.2010Examination requested  [2010/11]
29.10.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.03.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/36]
15.04.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2015/36]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.10.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
21.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
25.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]  HUWER S ET AL, "Adaptive change detection for real-time surveillance applications", PROCEEDINGS THIRD IEEE INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON VISUAL SURVEILLANCE IEEE COMPUT. SOC LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA, (2000), ISBN 0-7695-0698-4, pages 37 - 46, XP002480514 [X] 1-31 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VS.2000.856856
 [A]  JULIEN RICHEFEU M, "Détection et analyse du mouvement sur système de vision à base de rétine numérique", 20061214, (20061214), XP002478406 [A] 1-31 * Chapitres 2,3 *
 [A]  FREDRIK GUSTAFSSON, "Adaptive Filtering and Change Detection", 20000101, (20000101), XP002478407 [A] 1-31 * Chapitres 1,2,3,4 *
 [A]  ARNAUD VERDANT ET AL, "Low Power Motion Detection with Low Spatial and Temporal Resolution for CMOS Image Sensor", COMPUTER ARCHITECTURE FOR MACHINE PERCEPTION AND SENSING, 2006. CAMP 2 006. INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, PI, (20060901), ISBN 978-1-4244-0685-2, pages 12 - 17, XP031147889 [A] 1-31 * the whole document *