Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1975806

EP1975806 - Communications system providing shared client-server communications interface and related methods [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.02.2011
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Research In Motion Limited
295 Phillip Street
Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2008/40]For all designated states
Research In Motion Limited
295 Phillip Street
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Cooper, Blair
32430 SE43rd PL
Fall City, Washington 98024 / US
 [2008/51]
Former [2008/47]01 / Cooper, Blair
32430 SE43rd PL
Fall City, Washington 98024 / US
Representative(s)Fennell, Gareth Charles , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/40]Fennell, Gareth Charles , et al
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date08160448.026.02.2004
[2008/40]
Priority number, dateUS2004077596210.02.2004         Original published format: US 775962
US20030494325P11.08.2003         Original published format: US 494325 P
[2009/01]
Former [2008/51]US2004077596210.02.2004
Former [2008/40]US2004077596210.02.2004
US20030494325P11.08.2003
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1975806
Date:01.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1975806
Date:24.12.2008
[2008/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1975806
Date:07.04.2010
Language:EN
[2010/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:G06F15/16, H04L29/08
[2008/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/40]
TitleGerman:Kommunikationssystem mit gemeinsam genutzten Clientserver-Kommunikationsschnittstellen und zugehörige Verfahren[2008/40]
English:Communications system providing shared client-server communications interface and related methods[2008/40]
French:Système de communication fournissant une interface de communications client-serveur partagées et procédés associés[2008/40]
Examination procedure13.03.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.05.2009Examination requested  [2009/28]
22.10.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.02.2010Fee for grant paid
03.02.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04715115.4  / EP1661017
Divisional application(s)EP10150982.6  / EP2169561
Opposition(s)10.01.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
16.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
16.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
13.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
16.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.04.2010
BE07.04.2010
CZ07.04.2010
DK07.04.2010
EE07.04.2010
HU07.04.2010
NL07.04.2010
RO07.04.2010
SE07.04.2010
SI07.04.2010
SK07.04.2010
TR07.04.2010
CY02.06.2010
BG07.07.2010
GR08.07.2010
ES18.07.2010
PT09.08.2010
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT07.04.2010
BE07.04.2010
CZ07.04.2010
DK07.04.2010
EE07.04.2010
NL07.04.2010
RO07.04.2010
SE07.04.2010
SI07.04.2010
SK07.04.2010
TR07.04.2010
CY02.06.2010
BG07.07.2010
GR08.07.2010
ES18.07.2010
PT09.08.2010
Former [2013/42]AT07.04.2010
BE07.04.2010
CZ07.04.2010
DK07.04.2010
EE07.04.2010
NL07.04.2010
RO07.04.2010
SE07.04.2010
SI07.04.2010
SK07.04.2010
CY02.06.2010
BG07.07.2010
GR08.07.2010
ES18.07.2010
PT09.08.2010
Former [2011/25]AT07.04.2010
BE07.04.2010
CZ07.04.2010
DK07.04.2010
EE07.04.2010
NL07.04.2010
RO07.04.2010
SE07.04.2010
SI07.04.2010
SK07.04.2010
CY02.06.2010
GR08.07.2010
ES18.07.2010
PT09.08.2010
Former [2010/45]NL07.04.2010
SI07.04.2010
Former [2010/44]SI07.04.2010
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2003217149  (CRICHTON JOSEPH M [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0098] * * claim 5 *;
 [Y]WO0173522  (NETFISH TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * page 4, line 8 - page 5, line 9 * * page 6, line 1 - page 12, line 8 * * claims 1-15 *;
 [A]US2003046374  (HILT PATRICK [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0029] *;
 [A]EP1081918  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 2,7 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0020] *;
 [A]US2002087888  (YAMAKAWA TADASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0075] *
 [A]  FIELDING UC IRVINE J GETTYS J MOGUL DEC H FRYSTYK T BERNERS-LEE MIT/LCS R, "Hypertext Transfer Protocol -- HTTP/1.1; rfc2068.txt", IETF STANDARD, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (199701), ISSN 0000-0003, XP015007852 [A] 1,4,6,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [14.8] * * paragraph [14.20] * * paragraph [14.32] - paragraph [14.34] * * paragraph [14.46] *