Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020530

EP2020530 - Oscillation suppressor with impact stop spring [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.10.2010
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.11.2010  [2010/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZF Friedrichshafen AG
Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1
88046 Friedrichshafen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/06]For all designated states
ZF Friedrichshafen AG
88038 Friedrichshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Handke, Günther
Von-Steinau-Str. 3
97502 Euerbach / DE
 [2009/06]
Application number, filing date08160485.216.07.2008
[2009/06]
Priority number, dateDE2007103648901.08.2007         Original published format: DE102007036489
[2009/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2020530
Date:04.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2020530
Date:07.10.2009
[2009/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.09.2009
ClassificationInternational:F16F9/58
[2009/06]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2010/24]
Former [2009/06]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Schwingungsdämpfer mit einer Druckanschlagfeder[2009/06]
English:Oscillation suppressor with impact stop spring[2009/06]
French:Amortisseur d'oscillations doté d'un ressort de butée de pression[2009/06]
Examination procedure08.04.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/44]
18.05.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2010/44]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201003   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]DE6751258U  (HEMSCHEIDT MASCHF HERMANN [DE]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0558115  (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [AD]DE10247640  (AUDI AG [DE]) [AD] 1-7 * abstract *
by applicantDE10247640