Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020393

EP2020393 - Device for braking or stopping a wound roll after being thrown out of a position and method for operating a device for braking or stopping a wound roll [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.08.2012
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.09.2012  [2012/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Voith Patent GmbH
St. Pöltener Str. 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/06]For all designated states
Voith Patent GmbH
Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Nelles, Josef
Schevenhütter Str. 46
52224 Stolberg / DE
02 / Marquardt, Sven
Lerchenstr. 44
47918 Tönisvorst / DE
 [2009/06]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2011/41]
Application number, filing date08160931.523.07.2008
[2009/06]
Priority number, dateDE2007103586731.07.2007         Original published format: DE102007035867
[2009/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2020393
Date:04.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2020393
Date:14.10.2009
[2009/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2020393
Date:12.10.2011
Language:DE
[2011/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.09.2009
ClassificationInternational:B65H26/00, B65H19/30, B65G47/88
[2009/42]
Former International [2009/06]B65H26/00, B65H19/30
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FI,   IT,   SE [2010/25]
Former [2009/06]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Einrichtung zum Abbremsen oder Stoppen eines Wickels nach Auswurf aus einer Position und Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Einrichtung zum Abbremsen oder Stoppen eines Wickels[2009/06]
English:Device for braking or stopping a wound roll after being thrown out of a position and method for operating a device for braking or stopping a wound roll[2009/06]
French:Dispositif de freinage ou d'arrêt d'un rouleau après son éjection d'une position et procédé de fonctionnement d'un dispositif de freinage ou d'arrêt d'un rouleau[2009/06]
Examination procedure14.04.2010Examination requested  [2010/21]
15.04.2010Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
16.07.2010Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR
24.05.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.08.2011Fee for grant paid
24.08.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.05.2011
Opposition(s)13.07.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
01.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US5257748  (MORIZZO NICHOLAS L [US]) [A] 1,8 * column 7, lines 30-60 * * column 8, lines 37-49 * * column 11, lines 44-50 * * figures 1,6,7 *;
 [A]WO2006049471  (JEON JAE HYUNG [KR]) [A] 1,8 * paragraphs [0028] - [0031] * * figures 3-6 *;
 [A]WO03002439  (PERINI FABIO SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 1, lines 5-11 * * page 3, lines 8-29 * * page 4, lines 8-30 * * page 6, lines 8-16 * * page 7, line 8 - page 8, line 14 * * figures 1,2 *
by applicantDE102005017998
 EP0554700
 EP0705783