Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2022392

EP2022392 - Non-contact type tonometer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.12.2010
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.01.2011  [2011/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON
75-1, Hasunuma-cho
Itabashi-ku
Tokyo 174-8580 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON
75-1, Hasunuma-cho, Itabashi-ku
Tokyo 174-8580 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Naito, Tomoko c/o Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON
75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku
Tokyo 174-8580 / JP
02 / Yanagi, Eiichi c/o Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON
75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku
Tokyo 174-8580 / JP
03 / Sagehashi, Hideo c/o Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON
75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku
Tokyo 174-8580 / JP
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Ilgart, Jean-Christophe
BREVALEX
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Ilgart, Jean-Christophe
BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date08160969.523.07.2008
[2009/07]
Priority number, dateJP2007019534027.07.2007         Original published format: JP 2007195340
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2022392
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2022392
Date:22.04.2009
[2009/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.03.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61B3/16
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2010/01]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kontaktfreies Tonometer[2009/07]
English:Non-contact type tonometer[2009/07]
French:Tonomètre sans contact[2009/07]
Examination procedure23.07.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
21.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.10.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
26.11.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
17.12.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.07.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/01]
17.08.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2011/01]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201003   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP2005177252  (TOPCON CORP) [Y] 1-4 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0064]; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]JP2002165763  (TOPCON CORP) [Y] 1-4 * cited by the applicant; paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0025]; figure 3 *;
 [A]US5936706  (TAKAGI AKINARI [JP]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 39 - line 63; figures 1,6A-6D *
by applicantJP2002165763
 JP2006334435