Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2025375

EP2025375 - Device, cooking game program, and recording medium with the program recorded thereon [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  19.03.2010
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.03.2010Refusal of applicationpublished on 21.04.2010  [2010/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cooking Mama Limited
Room 501, 5F, 113 Argyle Street Mongkok, Kowloon
Hong Kong / HK
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Nagashima, Takeshi
C/o Cooking Mama Limited Room 501, 5F, 113 Argyle Street Mongkok
Kowloon / CN
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Fearnside, Andrew Simon
Appleyard Lees
15 Clare Road
Halifax, HX1 2HY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/36]Fearnside, Andrew Simon
Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road
Halifax, HX1 2HY / GB
Former [2009/08]Rooney, John-Paul
Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax
HX1 2HY / GB
Application number, filing date08161288.928.07.2008
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateUS20070952659P30.07.2007         Original published format: US 952659 P
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2025375
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.10.2008
ClassificationInternational:A63F13/00
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung, Kochspielprogramm und Aufzeichnungsmedium mit dem aufgezeichneten Programm[2009/08]
English:Device, cooking game program, and recording medium with the program recorded thereon[2009/08]
French:Dispositif, programme de jeu de cuisine et support d'enregistrement sur lequel est enregistré le programme[2009/08]
Examination procedure28.07.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
25.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.2009Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/16]
05.11.2009Date of oral proceedings
26.11.2009Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
01.12.2009Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/16]
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0102070  (SONY COMP ENTERTAINMENT INC [JP]) [X] 1-13 * page 26, line 9 - page 27, line 15 *;
 [A]US2002022516  (FORDEN CHRISTOPHER ALLEN [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *
by applicantJP2000262748