blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2025854 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2025854



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 173
04.02.2014 Closing of application Search / examination 1
24.10.2013 Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
04.09.2013 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
03.05.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
03.05.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
03.05.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
03.05.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 25
05.02.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
30.01.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 9
20.07.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
08.06.2012 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
16.05.2012 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
03.05.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
03.05.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
03.05.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
03.05.2012 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
03.05.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
03.05.2012 Request for further processing Search / examination 3
01.03.2012 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 4
25.07.2011 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
22.06.2011 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.06.2011 European search opinion Search / examination 3
22.06.2011 European search report Search / examination 2
08.02.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
02.02.2011 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
01.02.2011 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
21.01.2009 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
03.12.2008 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
04.11.2008 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
29.10.2008 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
29.10.2008 Priority document Search / examination 32
22.08.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.08.2008 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.08.2008 Claims Search / examination 4
22.08.2008 Description Search / examination 13
22.08.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.07.2008 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
29.07.2008 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
29.07.2008 Drawings Search / examination 8
29.07.2008 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
29.07.2008 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 19