blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2025854


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
07.02.2014 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  12.03.2014  [2014/11]
23.10.2013 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
30.08.2013 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
03.05.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
01.02.2013 Change - representative published on  06.03.2013  [2013/10]
25.07.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.07.2012 Change - representative published on  22.08.2012  [2012/34]
15.05.2012 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
11.05.2012 Request for examination filed published on  13.06.2012  [2012/24]
11.05.2012 Change - designated states published on  13.06.2012  [2012/24]
09.05.2012 Amendment by applicant
09.05.2012 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
08.05.2012 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
08.05.2012 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
24.02.2012 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
24.02.2012 Definitive list of designations published on  28.03.2012  [2012/13]
22.07.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.06.2011 Publication of search report published on  20.07.2011  [2011/29]
17.06.2011 Change - classification published on  20.07.2011  [2011/29]
04.02.2011 Change - representative published on  09.03.2011  [2011/10]
31.07.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.01.2009 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  18.02.2009  [2009/08]