blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2025854
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2025854Global Dossier 20.07.2011A3
EP2025854 18.02.2009A2
Priority number Date
ITMI20071572 31.07.2007
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ITMI20071572 01.02.2009A1
Priority number Date
ITMI20071572 31.07.2007