blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2025854

Designated contracting statesAT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HR 
HU 
IE 
IS 
IT 
LI 
LT 
LU 
LV 
MC 
MT 
NL 
NO 
PL 
PT 
RO 
SE 
SI 
SK 
TR 
Examination procedure24.10.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2014/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
18.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201306   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:18.02.2009 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:18.02.2009 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL BA MK RS
 
Event date:20.07.2011 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:E06B 3/46 20060101AFI20081029BHEP
 
Event date:20.07.2011 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:E05D 15/10 20060101ALI20110616BHEP
 
Event date:20.07.2011 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:20.07.2011 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL BA MK RS
 
Event date:28.03.2012 
Event description:NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID
 
Event date:16.05.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R108
Code Expl.:-DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE
Effective DATE:20120328
 
Event date:13.06.2012 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20120503
 
Event date:13.06.2012 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTED)
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:29.05.2013 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20130503
 
Event date:12.03.2014 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20130914