Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2025854

EP2025854 - Flush closing sliding door arranged in a pocket in the wall [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.02.2014
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.02.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.03.2014  [2014/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Esposito, Pietro
Via Lambro 7
20129 Milan / IT
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Bonatto, Marco , et al
Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A.
Via Borgonuovo, 10
20121 Milano / IT
[2013/10]
Former [2012/34]Mati, Silvia , et al
Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10
20121 Milano / IT
Former [2011/10]Coletti, Raimondo , et al
Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10
20121 Milano / IT
Former [2009/08]Fusina, Gerolamo , et al
Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A, Via Borgonuovo, 10
20121 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date08161360.629.07.2008
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateIT2007MI0157231.07.2007         Original published format: IT MI20071572
[2009/08]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2025854
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2025854
Date:20.07.2011
[2011/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.06.2011
ClassificationInternational:E06B3/46, E05D15/10
[2011/29]
Former International [2009/08]E06B3/46
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2012/24]
Former [2012/13](deleted) 
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Bündig schliessende, in einer Wandaussparung angeordnete Schiebetür[2009/08]
English:Flush closing sliding door arranged in a pocket in the wall[2009/08]
French:Porte coulissante coplanaire agencée dans une cavité murale[2009/08]
Examination procedure03.05.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.05.2012Examination requested  [2012/24]
03.05.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.09.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/11]
24.10.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2014/11]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.05.2013
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
CY, TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CH, BG, BE, AT
03.05.2012Request for further processing filed
03.05.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.05.2012Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
03.05.2012Request for further processing filed
03.05.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.05.2012Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
03.05.2012Request for further processing filed
03.05.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.05.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
18.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201306   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XYI]WO9632561  (MURAKI KOUGYOU KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,5 * abstract * [Y] 3,4,6,8-10 [I] 11;
 [YA]US2002053166  (FRIES BROR [SE]) [Y] 3,4 * abstract * [A] 1,2;
 [YA]FR1119342  (M. EUGÈNE) [Y] 6,8-10 * the whole document * [A] 7