Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026443

EP2026443 - An energy storage process and system on a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  12.06.2015
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.06.2015Refusal of applicationpublished on 15.07.2015  [2015/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FPT Motorenforschung AG
Schlossgasse 2
9320 Arbon / CH
[2013/04]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
Iveco Motorenforschung AG
Schlossgasse
CH-9320 Arbon / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Gstrein, Wolfgang
Berglistr. 33
9320 Arbon / CH
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Franzolin, Luigi , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]Borsano, Corrado , et al
Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9
20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date08161536.131.07.2008
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateEP2007011378903.08.2007         Original published format: EP 07113789
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2026443
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2026443
Date:29.04.2009
[2009/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.03.2009
ClassificationInternational:H02J15/00, B60H1/00, F24H7/04, F28D20/02
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zum Speichern von Energie in einem Fahrzeug[2009/08]
English:An energy storage process and system on a vehicle[2009/08]
French:Procédé de stockage d'énergie et système sur un véhicule[2009/08]
Examination procedure06.10.2009Examination requested  [2009/46]
29.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.09.2014Date of oral proceedings
19.02.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
24.02.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/29]
06.03.2015Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/29]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.10.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
03.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
06.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
06.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
14.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0640503  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,7,9-12 * abstract * * column 4, line 3 - line 37 * * column 22, line 8 - column 26, line 47 * * figure 9 * [Y] 4,5,13-16;
 [YA]US3817322  (ASSELMAN G, et al) [Y] 4,5,13-16 * column 1, line 5 - line 7 * * column 1, line 58 - line 65 * * column 2, line 32 - line 51 * * column 5, line 39 - line 61 * * figure 1a * [A] 1-3,7;
 [A]US4753072  (JOHANSSON LENNART N [US], et al) [A] 1-3,7 * abstract *;
 [A]WO0079202  (YEDA RES & DEV [IL], et al) [A] 1-3,7,9 * abstract * * page 2, line 17 - page 5, line 13 * * figures 2-5,7 *;
 [A]EP1426720  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,13,14 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0827853  (ISAD ELECTRONIC SYS GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1,13,14 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9605476  (STORE HEAT & PRODUCE ENERGY INC [US]) [A] 10 * abstract * * page 13, line 24 - line 30 *;
 [A]US3986665  (KOFINK SIEGFRIED [DE], et al) [A] 1,13,14 * abstract * * page 6, line 37 - line 48 *