Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026557

EP2026557 - Image reading apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.09.2018
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.09.2018New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Oki Data Corporation
11-22, Shibaura 4-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8551 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
Oki Data Corporation
11-22, Shibaura 4-Chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8551 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Watanabe, Yuichi
c/o Oki Data Corporation 11-22 Shibaura 4-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8551 / JP
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
Byron House
Cambridge Business Park
Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/14]Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej , et al
Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
Former [2009/08]Pisani, Diana Jean , et al
Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date08161541.131.07.2008
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateJP2007021189815.08.2007         Original published format: JP 2007211898
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2026557
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2026557
Date:04.03.2009
[2009/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04N1/32
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2009/46]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Bildlesevorrichtung[2009/08]
English:Image reading apparatus[2009/08]
French:Appareil de lecture d'images[2009/08]
Examination procedure29.06.2009Examination requested  [2009/32]
16.07.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.09.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
15.10.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
11.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.06.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.03.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
20.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
20.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
30.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
18.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
10.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
12.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
11.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[A]DE19948330  (FUTURE SOFTWARE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * claim 1 *;
 [A]US2007139683  (WEGENG DONALD L [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract *;
 [A]US2006268369  (KUO SHIH-ZHENG [TW]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * figures 1,3,4 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0008] , [0012] , [0028] , [0029] *;
 [A]US2006256375  (ABE YOSHIHIKO [JP]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0111] - [0114] *
by applicantJP2003333264
 DE19948330
 US2007139683