blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2020752 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2020752



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 164
06.01.2012 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
03.02.2011 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.01.2011 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
11.01.2011 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
11.01.2011 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 3
30.12.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.12.2010 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
30.12.2010 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
30.12.2010 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
30.12.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
20.12.2010 Notice concerning a request for amendments/ corrections Search / examination 1
25.11.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.11.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
25.11.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
25.11.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.11.2010 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
30.08.2010 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
30.08.2010 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
30.08.2010 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
30.08.2010 Text intended for grant Search / examination 20
14.10.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.10.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
14.10.2009 Claims Search / examination 4
14.10.2009 Description Search / examination 2
14.10.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.10.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
12.10.2009 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
25.09.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.09.2009 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 2
25.09.2009 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 13
25.09.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.09.2009 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 1
12.08.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.06.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.06.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
15.06.2009 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
07.05.2009 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
27.04.2009 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
21.04.2009 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
06.02.2009 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
08.01.2009 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
19.11.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.11.2008 European search opinion Search / examination 5
19.11.2008 European search report Search / examination 2
08.10.2008 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
01.10.2008 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 31
31.07.2008 Abstract Search / examination 1
31.07.2008 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
31.07.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
31.07.2008 Description Search / examination 10
31.07.2008 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
31.07.2008 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
31.07.2008 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
31.07.2008 Drawings Search / examination 7
31.07.2008 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5