blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2020752


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
04.10.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.11.2013  [2013/45]
27.09.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.10.2013  [2013/44]
17.05.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.06.2013  [2013/25]
27.07.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2012  [2012/35]
11.05.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.06.2012  [2012/24]
17.02.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.03.2012  [2012/12]
06.01.2012 No opposition filed within time limit published on  08.02.2012  [2012/06]
30.12.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.02.2012  [2012/05]
02.12.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.01.2012  [2012/01]
25.11.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.12.2011  [2011/52]
18.11.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2011  [2011/51]
11.11.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2011  [2011/50]
04.11.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2011  [2011/49]
21.10.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.11.2011  [2011/47]
07.10.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.11.2011  [2011/45]
23.09.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.10.2011  [2011/43]
16.09.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.10.2011  [2011/42]
09.09.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.10.2011  [2011/41]
26.08.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.09.2011  [2011/39]
19.08.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.09.2011  [2011/38]
12.08.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.09.2011  [2011/37]
05.08.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.09.2011  [2011/36]
04.03.2011 Change - divisional application(s) published on  06.04.2011  [2011/14]
28.01.2011 (Expected) grant published on  02.03.2011  [2011/09]
11.01.2011 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
11.01.2011 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
20.08.2010 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
06.07.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.10.2009 New entry: Reply to examination report
09.10.2009 Change - applicant published on  11.11.2009  [2009/46]
04.09.2009 Definitive list of designations published on  07.10.2009  [2009/41]
07.08.2009 First examination report
06.08.2009 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
19.06.2009 Request for examination filed published on  22.07.2009  [2009/30]
01.05.2009 Change - representative published on  03.06.2009  [2009/23]
02.01.2009 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  04.02.2009  [2009/06]