blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2020752 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP08161542 EP11156483



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2323268Global Dossier 18.05.2011A1
Priority number Date
US83296007 02.08.2007
EP08161542 31.07.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US2009036068Global Dossier 05.02.2009A1
Priority number Date
US83296007 02.08.2007
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP4904319BGlobal Dossier 28.03.2012B2
JP2009038802 19.02.2009A
Priority number Date
US83296007 02.08.2007
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2020752Global Dossier 02.03.2011B1
EP2020752 04.02.2009A1
Priority number Date
US83296007 02.08.2007
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT500655T 15.03.2011T
Priority number Date
US83296007 02.08.2007
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE602008005214D 14.04.2011D1
Priority number Date
US83296007 02.08.2007
TypeType Divisional application
 EP2323268