Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020752

EP2020752 - Wireless system having high spectral purity [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.01.2012
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Icera Canada ULC
700, 2nd Street S.W.
1200 Calgary, Alberta T2P 4V5 / CA
[2009/46]
Former [2009/06]For all designated states
SiRiFIC Wireless Corporation
460 Phillip Street, Suite 300
Waterloo, ON N2L 5J2 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Hughes, Simon
253 Whitmore Drive
Waterloo Ontario N2K 2M5 / CA
02 / Jantzi, Jason
314 Hidden Creek Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2N 3N3 / CA
03 / Uldry, Xavier
17-457 Albert Street
Waterloo Ontario N2L 5A7 / CA
 [2009/06]
Representative(s)Driver, Virginia Rozanne
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/23]Driver, Virginia Rozanne
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
Former [2009/06]Büchel, Kaminski & Partner
Patentanwälte Est. Austrasse 79
9490 Vaduz / LI
Application number, filing date08161542.931.07.2008
[2009/06]
Priority number, dateUS2007083296002.08.2007         Original published format: US 832960
[2009/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2020752
Date:04.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2020752
Date:02.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:H04B1/04
[2009/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/06]
TitleGerman:Drahtloses System mit hoher Spektrumsreinheit[2009/06]
English:Wireless system having high spectral purity[2009/06]
French:Système sans fil disposant d'une pureté spectrale élevée[2009/06]
Examination procedure15.06.2009Examination requested  [2009/30]
12.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.12.2010Fee for grant paid
30.12.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP11156483.7  / EP2323268
Opposition(s)05.12.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2012/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.03.2011
BE02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
CZ02.03.2011
DK02.03.2011
EE02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
HR02.03.2011
HU02.03.2011
IT02.03.2011
LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
MT02.03.2011
PL02.03.2011
RO02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
SI02.03.2011
SK02.03.2011
TR02.03.2011
BG02.06.2011
NO02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
IS02.07.2011
PT04.07.2011
IE31.07.2011
LU31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT02.03.2011
BE02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
CZ02.03.2011
DK02.03.2011
EE02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
HR02.03.2011
IT02.03.2011
LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
MT02.03.2011
PL02.03.2011
RO02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
SI02.03.2011
SK02.03.2011
TR02.03.2011
BG02.06.2011
NO02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
IS02.07.2011
PT04.07.2011
IE31.07.2011
LU31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
Former [2013/25]AT02.03.2011
BE02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
CZ02.03.2011
DK02.03.2011
EE02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
HR02.03.2011
IT02.03.2011
LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
MT02.03.2011
PL02.03.2011
RO02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
SI02.03.2011
SK02.03.2011
BG02.06.2011
NO02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
IS02.07.2011
PT04.07.2011
IE31.07.2011
LU31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
Former [2012/35]AT02.03.2011
BE02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
CZ02.03.2011
DK02.03.2011
EE02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
HR02.03.2011
IT02.03.2011
LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
MT02.03.2011
PL02.03.2011
RO02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
SI02.03.2011
SK02.03.2011
BG02.06.2011
NO02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
IS02.07.2011
PT04.07.2011
IE31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
Former [2012/24]AT02.03.2011
BE02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
CZ02.03.2011
DK02.03.2011
EE02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
HR02.03.2011
IT02.03.2011
LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
MT02.03.2011
PL02.03.2011
RO02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
SI02.03.2011
SK02.03.2011
BG02.06.2011
NO02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
IS02.07.2011
PT04.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
Former [2012/12]AT02.03.2011
BE02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
CZ02.03.2011
DK02.03.2011
EE02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
HR02.03.2011
LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
MT02.03.2011
PL02.03.2011
RO02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
SI02.03.2011
SK02.03.2011
BG02.06.2011
NO02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
IS02.07.2011
PT04.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
Former [2012/05]AT02.03.2011
BE02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
CZ02.03.2011
EE02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
HR02.03.2011
LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
MT02.03.2011
RO02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
SI02.03.2011
SK02.03.2011
BG02.06.2011
NO02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
IS02.07.2011
PT04.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
Former [2011/50]AT02.03.2011
BE02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
CZ02.03.2011
EE02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
HR02.03.2011
LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
RO02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
SI02.03.2011
SK02.03.2011
BG02.06.2011
NO02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
IS02.07.2011
PT04.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
Former [2011/49]AT02.03.2011
BE02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
CZ02.03.2011
EE02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
HR02.03.2011
LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
RO02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
SI02.03.2011
SK02.03.2011
BG02.06.2011
NO02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
PT04.07.2011
Former [2011/47]AT02.03.2011
BE02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
EE02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
HR02.03.2011
LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
SI02.03.2011
BG02.06.2011
NO02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
PT04.07.2011
Former [2011/41]AT02.03.2011
BE02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
HR02.03.2011
LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
SI02.03.2011
BG02.06.2011
NO02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
Former [2011/38]AT02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
HR02.03.2011
LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
SI02.03.2011
BG02.06.2011
NO02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
Former [2011/37]CY02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
HR02.03.2011
LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
SI02.03.2011
BG02.06.2011
NO02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
Former [2011/36]HR02.03.2011
LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
NO02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0926818  (RADIO FREQUENCY SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0049] * * figures 1-3 *;
 [X]WO2006137007  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * page 6, line 16 - line 24 * * figure 3 *;
 [X]US2005093627  (VICE MICHAEL W [US]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0019] * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US5095285  (KHATIBZADEH M ALI [US]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * column 2, line 65 - column 4, line 22 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]US2004008082  (DOW GEE SAMUEL [US]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0078]; figures 8-10 *
by applicantWO2006137007
 EP0926818
 US2005093627