Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023460

EP2023460 - Mems based battery monitoring [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2017
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.12.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2017No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.12.2017  [2017/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
115 Tabor Road
Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US
[2015/51]
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245
Morristown NJ 07960 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Coblanu, Cornel P.
Vladeasa No. 11, Bloc C33, Sc. A, Et. 6, Apt. 38
061672 Bucharest / RO
02 / Dumitru, Viorel-Georgel
Brebenei Nr. 3, Bl. 5, Ap. 6
100077 Ploiesti / RO
03 / Georgescu, Ion
Aleea Deleni nr. 2, Bl. T 66, SC.2, et.4, Apt.51
023732 Bucharest / RO
04 / Gologanu, Mihai
Honeywell International Inc
Patent Services M\S - AB\2B
P.O.Box 22445
Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US
05 / Costea, Stefan D.
Cetatea de Balta 26
060969 Bucharest / RO
 [2017/03]
Former [2009/07]01 / Coblanu, Cornel P.
Vladeasa No. 11, Bloc C33, Sc. A, Et. 6, Apt. 38
061672, Bucharest / RO
02 / Dumitru, Viorel-Georgel
Brebenei Nr. 3, Bl. 5, Ap. 6
100077, Ploiesti / RO
03 / Georgescu, Ion
Aleea Deleni nr. 2, Bl. T 66, SC.2, et.4, Apt.51
023732, Bucharest / RO
04 / Gologanu, Mihai, Honeywell International Inc
Patent Services M/S-AB/2B, P.O.Box 22445
Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US
05 / Costea, Stefan D.
Cetatea de Balta 26
060969, Bucharest / RO
Representative(s)Houghton, Mark Phillip , et al
Patent Outsourcing Limited
1 King Street
Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB
[2017/03]
Former [2009/07]Buckley, Guy Julian
Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell
Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB
Application number, filing date08161607.031.07.2008
[2009/07]
Priority number, dateUS2007089057007.08.2007         Original published format: US 890570
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2023460
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2023460
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2023460
Date:18.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:H02J7/00
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2016/39]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:MEMS-basierte Batterieüberwachung[2009/07]
English:Mems based battery monitoring[2009/07]
French:Surveillance de batterie à base de mems[2009/07]
Examination procedure31.07.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
14.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.07.2016Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
26.08.2016Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
02.09.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.12.2016Fee for grant paid
05.12.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.12.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.01.2016
Opposition(s)19.10.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
16.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
10.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
08.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
08.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
09.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1018792  (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0002] , [0020] , [0024]; figure 2 *;
 [A]WO0016429  (RAYCHEM LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 14, paragraph 4; figure 23 *;
 [A]JP2006352998  (NEC TOKIN CORP, et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]JP2006320048  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2006076923  (EAVES STEPHEN S [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0048]; figure 10 *;
 [A]EP0349837  (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [IT]) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 54 - column 3, line 17; figure 1 *
by applicantUS6388299
 US6720634
 US7034375