Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026252

EP2026252 - A printing job control system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.07.2014
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.08.2014  [2014/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester
New York 14644 / US
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Mestha, Lalit K
20 Mildenhall Ridge
Fairport, NY 14450 / US
02 / Fisher, Peter S
3095 Lombardy Road
Pasadena, CA 91107 / US
03 / Gil, Alvaro E
125 Runnymede Road
Rochester, NY 14618 / US
04 / Love, Tonya L
44 Golden Rod Lane
Rochester, NY 14623 / US
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Skone James, Robert Edmund
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]Skone James, Robert Edmund
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date08161888.606.08.2008
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateUS2007089057407.08.2007         Original published format: US 890574
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2026252
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2026252
Date:03.03.2010
[2010/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.01.2010
ClassificationInternational:G06K19/06, G06F3/12, G06F21/00, G06Q10/00, B42C19/00
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2010/45]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Druckauftragssteuerungssystem und -verfahren[2009/08]
English:A printing job control system and method[2009/08]
French:Système et procédé de contrôle d'une tâche d'impression[2009/08]
Examination procedure03.09.2010Examination requested  [2010/41]
24.09.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/32]
27.03.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2014/32]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.09.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201306   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2002027674  (TOKUNAGA KAZUYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * column A * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0096] * * figures 1-3; claims 1-8 *;
 [A]US2003146288  (BERSON WILLIAM [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0082] *;
 [A]US6199765  (UHLING THOMAS F [US]) [A] 1-15 * column A * * column 2, line 24 - column 4, line 48 * * figures 1-3 *
by applicantUS2002027674
 US2003146288
 US6199765
 US20060507405
 US20060507406
 US20060607643