Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2022516

EP2022516 - Extracorporeal blood pump with disposable pump head having magnetically levitated impeller [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/07]Extracorporeal blood pump with disposable pump head portion having magnetically levitated impeller
[2011/15]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.12.2012
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.01.2013  [2013/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Terumo Cardiovascular Systems Corporation
6200 Jackson Road Ann Arbor
Michigan 48103 / US
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / Garzaniti, Erin Jessica Lindsay
5457 Warren Road
Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US
02 / Gay, Eric L
920 Mixtwood
Ann Arbor, MI 48103 / US
 [2012/05]
Former [2009/07]01 / Garzaniti, Erin Jessica Lindsay
5457 Warren Road
Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US
02 / Gay, Eric L
920 Mixtwood
Ann Arbor, MI 48103 / US
Representative(s)Giles, Ashley Simon
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/05]Giles, Ashley Simon
Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
Former [2009/07]Giles, Ashley Simon
Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
Application number, filing date08161967.807.08.2008
[2009/07]
Priority number, dateUS20070963841P07.08.2007         Original published format: US 963841 P
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2022516
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2022516
Date:25.02.2009
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2022516
Date:01.02.2012
Language:EN
[2012/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/10
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2009/44]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Extrakorporale Blutpumpe mit Einweg-Pumpenkopf mit magnetisch schwebendem Pumpenrad[2011/15]
English:Extracorporeal blood pump with disposable pump head having magnetically levitated impeller[2011/15]
French:Pompe sanguine extracorporelle ayant une tête de pompe jetable disposant d'une turbine à lévitation magnétique[2011/15]
Former [2009/07]Extrakorporale Blutpumpe mit Einweg-Pumpenkopfteil mit magnetisch schwebendem Pumpenrad
Former [2009/07]Extracorporeal blood pump with disposable pump head portion having magnetically levitated impeller
Former [2009/07]Pompe sanguine extracorporelle avec une portion de tête de pompe jetable disposant d'une turbine magnétiquement en lévitation
Examination procedure03.04.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.08.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
19.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/46]
01.10.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
27.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.08.2011Fee for grant paid
01.08.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP11160823.8  / EP2345439
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.10.2010
Opposition(s)05.11.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2013/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
08.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5947703  (NOJIRI TOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,9-11 * column 11, line 44 - column 15, line 24; figures 19-27 * [Y] 12-14;
 [A]US6623475  (SIESS THORSTEN [DE]) [A] 1-16 * column 4 - column 6; figures 5,8 *;
 [A]US5575630  (NAKAZAWA TADASHI [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 4 - column 7; figures 1-3,5,6,8,10 *
 [Y]  - SHEN J X ET AL, "A Novel Compact PMSM with Magnetic Bearing for Artificial Heart Application", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20000701), vol. 36, no. 4, ISSN 0093-9994, XP011022810 [Y] 12-14 * pages 1,2; figure 3a *
by applicantUS6811749
 US6575717
 US6589030
 US7212550
 US7128538
 US2005014991
 US5947703