Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026113

EP2026113 - Zoom lens of the telephoto type having four lens groups [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.12.2012
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.01.2013  [2013/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Wakazono, Tsuyoshi
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
3-30-2, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP
02 / Nakamura, Tomoyuki
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
3-30-2, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP
 [2012/08]
Former [2009/08]01 / Wakazono, Tsuyoshi
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP
02 / Nakamura, Tomoyuki
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP
Representative(s)Hitching, Peter Matthew , et al
Canon Europe Ltd
European Patent Department
3 The Square
Stockley Park
Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/08]Hitching, Peter Matthew , et al
Canon Europe Ltd 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex
UB11 1ET / GB
Former [2009/36]Hitching, Peter Matthew , et al
Canon Europe Ltd 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex
UB11 1ET / GB
Former [2009/31]Sharp, Alan Cooper
Canon Europe Ltd. European Patent Department 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Uxbridge
UB11 1JA / GB
Former [2009/08]Sharp, Alan Cooper
Canon Europe Ltd. European Patent Department 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Uxbridge
Middlesex UB11 1JA / GB
Application number, filing date08162030.407.08.2008
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateJP2007020509707.08.2007         Original published format: JP 2007205097
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2026113
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2026113
Date:22.02.2012
Language:EN
[2012/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:G02B15/173, // G02B13/18
[2011/24]
Former International [2009/08]G02B15/173
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/43]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Telezoomobjektiv mit vier Linsengruppen[2009/08]
English:Zoom lens of the telephoto type having four lens groups[2009/08]
French:Zoom optique du type téléobjectif ayant quatre groupes de lentilles[2009/08]
Examination procedure17.08.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/39]
26.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.09.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.01.2012Fee for grant paid
16.01.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.10.2010
Opposition(s)23.11.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2013/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XD]US5745300  (USUI FUMIAKI [JP], et al) [XD] 1-5 * column 18, line 29 - line 51; figure 9; example 5; claim 13; table 2 *
by applicantUS5745300
 US6545818
 US6124982