Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026511

EP2026511 - Virtual network architecture for space data processing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019Refusal of applicationpublished on 27.03.2019 [2019/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
III Holdings 12, LLC
2711 Centerville Road, Suite 400
Wilmington, DE 19808 / US
[2017/51]
Former [2015/51]For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
115 Tabor Road
Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
Law Department AB/2B 101 Columbia Road
Morristown, NJ 07962 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Bueno, David R.
8354 66th Way N
Pinellas Park, FL 33781 / US
02 / Kimmery, Clifford E.
1623 Jacob Court
Clearwater, FL 33756 / US
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Ablett, Graham Keith , et al
Ablett & Stebbing
7-8 Market Place
London, W1W 8AG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]Buckley, Guy Julian
Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell
Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB
Application number, filing date08162035.307.08.2008
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateUS2007083802313.08.2007         Original published format: US 838023
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2026511
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2026511
Date:11.07.2012
Language:EN
[2012/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.06.2012
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/46
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2013/12]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Virtuelle Netzwerkarchitektur zur Raumdatenverarbeitung[2009/08]
English:Virtual network architecture for space data processing[2009/08]
French:Architecture de réseau virtuel pour le traitement de données d'espace[2009/08]
Examination procedure07.08.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
14.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.01.2013Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
19.02.2013Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
04.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.06.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2018Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/13]
04.10.2018Date of oral proceedings
12.11.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/13]
12.11.2018Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP19153011.2
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.06.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
08.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
08.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
07.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
07.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
07.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
05.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
07.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
07.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9704603  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-10 * page 2, line 19 - page 23, line 25 *;
 [X]US5467348  (FUJII SHIGEO [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 2, line 34 - column 4, line 47 *;
 [X]US2002097725  (DIGHE RAJIV [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0075] *
by applicantWO9704603
 US5467348
 US2002097725