Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2028668

EP2028668 - Photovoltaic cell with immiscible electrolytes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.11.2013
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives
Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc
75015 Paris / FR
[2013/01]
Former [2010/18]For all designated states
Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives
Bâtiment D "Le Ponant" 25, rue Leblanc
75015 Paris / FR
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE
25, rue Leblanc Immeuble Le Ponant D
75015 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Fusalba, Florence
55 bis, rue de Stalingrad
38000 GRENOBLE / FR
02 / Remiat, Bruno
9, rue Lafayette
38000 GRENOBLE / FR
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Ilgart, Jean-Christophe
BREVALEX
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2013/01]Ilgart, Jean-Christophe
BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
Former [2009/09]Ilgart, Jean-Christophe
BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date08162356.314.08.2008
[2009/09]
Priority number, dateFR2007005713923.08.2007         Original published format: FR 0757139
[2009/09]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2028668
Date:25.02.2009
Language:FR
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2028668
Date:02.01.2013
Language:FR
[2013/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.09.2008
ClassificationInternational:H01G9/20
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
TitleGerman:Photovoltaikzelle mit nicht-mischbaren Elektrolyten[2012/29]
English:Photovoltaic cell with immiscible electrolytes[2009/09]
French:Cellule photovoltaïque à electrolytes non miscibles[2012/29]
Former [2009/09]Photovoltaikzelle mit nicht mischbaren Elektrolyten
Former [2009/09]Cellule photovoltaique a electrolytes non miscibles
Examination procedure23.04.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.04.2009Examination requested  [2009/23]
16.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.11.2012Fee for grant paid
22.11.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.12.2009
Opposition(s)03.10.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
24.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
19.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.08.2008
AT02.01.2013
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
HR02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
MC02.01.2013
MT02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
TR02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
NO02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
IE14.08.2013
LU14.08.2013
BE31.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT02.01.2013
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
HR02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
MC02.01.2013
MT02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
TR02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
NO02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
IE14.08.2013
BE31.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
Former [2014/33]AT02.01.2013
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
HR02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
MC02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
NO02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
IE14.08.2013
BE31.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
Former [2014/26]AT02.01.2013
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
HR02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
MC02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
NO02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
BE31.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
Former [2014/20]AT02.01.2013
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
HR02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
MC02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
NO02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
Former [2013/52]AT02.01.2013
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
HR02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
NO02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2013/49]AT02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
HR02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
NO02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2013/48]AT02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
HR02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
NO02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2013/41]AT02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
HR02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
NO02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2013/40]AT02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
NO02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2013/38]AT02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
NO02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
Former [2013/37]AT02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
NO02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
Former [2013/36]AT02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
NO02.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
Former [2013/35]CZ02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
NO02.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
Former [2013/34]LT02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
NO02.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
Former [2013/33]LT02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
NO02.04.2013
Former [2013/26]SI02.01.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]LV12930  (BERZINS JANIS [LV], et al) [X] 1 * abstract *;
 [X]  KOTOV N A ET AL, "Photoelectrochemical effect at the interface of immiscible electrolyte solutions", J ELECTROANAL CHEM INTERFACIAL ELECTROCHEM; JOURNAL OF ELECTROANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY AND INTERFACIAL ELECTROCHEMISTRY JUN 11 1990, (19900611), vol. 285, no. 1-2, pages 223 - 240, XP002473813 [X] 1,5,6,8-10,14 * figures 1,2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-0728(90)87123-2
 [XA]  SAMEC Z ET AL, "A generalised model for dynamic photocurrent responses at dye-sensitised liquidliquid interfaces", JOURNAL OF ELECTROANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY AND INTERFACIAL ELECTROCHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20050401), vol. 577, no. 2, ISSN 0022-0728, pages 323 - 337, XP004786539 [X] 1,5,6,8-10,14 * abstract * [A] 14

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jelechem.2004.12.009
 [A]  E. FRANKLIN, A. BLAKERS, K. WEBER, V. EVERETT, P. DEENAPANRAY, "Towards a Simplified 20% Efficient Sliver Cell", IEEE 4TH WORLD CONFERENCE ON PHOTOVOLTAIC ENERGY CONVERSION, (200605), XP002473814 [A] * the whole document *