Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027891

EP2027891 - Device for a floor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.02.2012
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HGB Backstrand AB
Box 7210
402 34 Göteborg / SE
[2009/09]
Inventor(s)01 / Giorgi, Stefan
Mellanvägen 4A
SE-433 61, Sävedalen / SE
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Bergentall, Annika Maria , et al
Cegumark AB
P.O. Box 53047
400 14 Göteborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]Bergentall, Annika Maria , et al
Cegumark AB, P.O. Box 53047
400 14 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date08162385.214.08.2008
[2009/09]
Priority number, dateSE2007000192024.08.2007         Original published format: SE 0701920
[2009/09]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2027891
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2027891
Date:20.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.12.2008
ClassificationInternational:A63B5/08
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung für einen Boden[2009/09]
English:Device for a floor[2009/09]
French:Dispositif pour plancher[2009/09]
Examination procedure06.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/38]
10.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.12.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.01.2011Fee for grant paid
12.01.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.01.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201003   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.2011
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.04.2011
BE20.04.2011
CY20.04.2011
CZ20.04.2011
DK20.04.2011
EE20.04.2011
FI20.04.2011
HR20.04.2011
HU20.04.2011
IT20.04.2011
LT20.04.2011
LV20.04.2011
MT20.04.2011
NL20.04.2011
PL20.04.2011
RO20.04.2011
SE20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
SK20.04.2011
TR20.04.2011
BG20.07.2011
NO20.07.2011
GR21.07.2011
ES31.07.2011
IE14.08.2011
LU14.08.2011
IS20.08.2011
PT22.08.2011
FR31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT20.04.2011
BE20.04.2011
CY20.04.2011
CZ20.04.2011
DK20.04.2011
EE20.04.2011
FI20.04.2011
HR20.04.2011
IT20.04.2011
LT20.04.2011
LV20.04.2011
MT20.04.2011
NL20.04.2011
PL20.04.2011
RO20.04.2011
SE20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
SK20.04.2011
TR20.04.2011
BG20.07.2011
NO20.07.2011
GR21.07.2011
ES31.07.2011
IE14.08.2011
LU14.08.2011
IS20.08.2011
PT22.08.2011
FR31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
Former [2013/29]AT20.04.2011
BE20.04.2011
CY20.04.2011
CZ20.04.2011
DK20.04.2011
EE20.04.2011
FI20.04.2011
HR20.04.2011
IT20.04.2011
LT20.04.2011
LV20.04.2011
MT20.04.2011
NL20.04.2011
PL20.04.2011
RO20.04.2011
SE20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
SK20.04.2011
BG20.07.2011
NO20.07.2011
GR21.07.2011
ES31.07.2011
IE14.08.2011
LU14.08.2011
IS20.08.2011
PT22.08.2011
FR31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
Former [2013/25]AT20.04.2011
BE20.04.2011
CY20.04.2011
CZ20.04.2011
DK20.04.2011
EE20.04.2011
FI20.04.2011
HR20.04.2011
IT20.04.2011
LT20.04.2011
LV20.04.2011
MT20.04.2011
NL20.04.2011
PL20.04.2011
RO20.04.2011
SE20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
SK20.04.2011
NO20.07.2011
GR21.07.2011
ES31.07.2011
IE14.08.2011
LU14.08.2011
IS20.08.2011
PT22.08.2011
FR31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
Former [2012/37]AT20.04.2011
BE20.04.2011
CY20.04.2011
CZ20.04.2011
DK20.04.2011
EE20.04.2011
FI20.04.2011
HR20.04.2011
IT20.04.2011
LT20.04.2011
LV20.04.2011
MT20.04.2011
NL20.04.2011
PL20.04.2011
RO20.04.2011
SE20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
SK20.04.2011
NO20.07.2011
GR21.07.2011
ES31.07.2011
IE14.08.2011
IS20.08.2011
PT22.08.2011
FR31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
Former [2012/35]AT20.04.2011
BE20.04.2011
CY20.04.2011
CZ20.04.2011
DK20.04.2011
EE20.04.2011
FI20.04.2011
HR20.04.2011
IT20.04.2011
LT20.04.2011
LV20.04.2011
MT20.04.2011
NL20.04.2011
PL20.04.2011
RO20.04.2011
SE20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
SK20.04.2011
NO20.07.2011
GR21.07.2011
ES31.07.2011
IE14.08.2011
IS20.08.2011
PT22.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
Former [2012/24]AT20.04.2011
BE20.04.2011
CY20.04.2011
CZ20.04.2011
DK20.04.2011
EE20.04.2011
FI20.04.2011
HR20.04.2011
IT20.04.2011
LT20.04.2011
LV20.04.2011
MT20.04.2011
NL20.04.2011
PL20.04.2011
RO20.04.2011
SE20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
SK20.04.2011
NO20.07.2011
GR21.07.2011
ES31.07.2011
IS20.08.2011
PT22.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
Former [2012/18]AT20.04.2011
BE20.04.2011
CY20.04.2011
CZ20.04.2011
DK20.04.2011
EE20.04.2011
FI20.04.2011
HR20.04.2011
LT20.04.2011
LV20.04.2011
MT20.04.2011
NL20.04.2011
PL20.04.2011
RO20.04.2011
SE20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
SK20.04.2011
NO20.07.2011
GR21.07.2011
ES31.07.2011
IS20.08.2011
PT22.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
Former [2012/12]AT20.04.2011
BE20.04.2011
CY20.04.2011
CZ20.04.2011
DK20.04.2011
EE20.04.2011
FI20.04.2011
HR20.04.2011
LT20.04.2011
LV20.04.2011
MT20.04.2011
NL20.04.2011
PL20.04.2011
RO20.04.2011
SE20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
SK20.04.2011
NO20.07.2011
GR21.07.2011
ES31.07.2011
IS20.08.2011
PT22.08.2011
Former [2012/05]AT20.04.2011
BE20.04.2011
CY20.04.2011
FI20.04.2011
HR20.04.2011
LT20.04.2011
LV20.04.2011
MT20.04.2011
NL20.04.2011
SE20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
NO20.07.2011
GR21.07.2011
ES31.07.2011
IS20.08.2011
PT22.08.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2012/02]AT20.04.2011
BE20.04.2011
CY20.04.2011
FI20.04.2011
HR20.04.2011
LT20.04.2011
LV20.04.2011
NL20.04.2011
SE20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
NO20.07.2011
GR21.07.2011
ES31.07.2011
IS20.08.2011
PT22.08.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2012/01]AT20.04.2011
BE20.04.2011
CY20.04.2011
FI20.04.2011
HR20.04.2011
LT20.04.2011
LV20.04.2011
SE20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
NO20.07.2011
GR21.07.2011
ES31.07.2011
IS20.08.2011
PT22.08.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2011/52]AT20.04.2011
CY20.04.2011
FI20.04.2011
HR20.04.2011
LT20.04.2011
LV20.04.2011
SE20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
NO20.07.2011
GR21.07.2011
ES31.07.2011
IS20.08.2011
PT22.08.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2011/50]CY20.04.2011
FI20.04.2011
HR20.04.2011
LT20.04.2011
LV20.04.2011
SE20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
NO20.07.2011
GR21.07.2011
ES31.07.2011
IS20.08.2011
PT22.08.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2011/49]CY20.04.2011
FI20.04.2011
HR20.04.2011
LT20.04.2011
SE20.04.2011
NO20.07.2011
GR21.07.2011
ES31.07.2011
PT22.08.2011
Former [2011/48]LT20.04.2011
SE20.04.2011
NO20.07.2011
PT22.08.2011
Former [2011/47]LT20.04.2011
NO20.07.2011
PT22.08.2011
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2638968  (REUTHER RICHARD) [A] 1-9 * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 7, paragraph 3 * * page 10, line 16 - line 24; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0086897  (REUTHER RICHARD) [A] 1-9 * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 2, paragraph 2; figures 1-6 *;
 [AD]SE526997  (HGB BACKSTRAND AB [SE]) [AD] 1-9 * the whole document *
by applicantSE526997
 DE2638968