Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2025224

EP2025224 - Filter cartridge assembly with water collection [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.08.2013
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.09.2013  [2013/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tetra Holding (US), Inc.
3001 Commerce Street Blacksburg
Virginia 24060 / US
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Huehn, Donald Barry
3006 Stradford Lane
Blacksburg, NC 24060 / US
02 / Roark, Joseph
505 Sky View Drive
Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US
03 / Warden, Jeffrey
12213 Dunard Steet
Raleigh, NC 27614 / US
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]Zimmermann & Partner
Isartorplatz 1
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date08162427.214.08.2008
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateUS2007089338315.08.2007         Original published format: US 893383
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2025224
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.2008
ClassificationInternational:A01K63/04
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   PL [2009/43]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Filterpatronenanordnung mit Wassersammlung[2009/08]
English:Filter cartridge assembly with water collection[2009/08]
French:Ensemble de cartouche de filtre avec collecte d'eau[2009/08]
Examination procedure15.01.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.05.2009Examination requested  [2009/27]
19.08.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
24.09.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
09.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/37]
17.04.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2013/37]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.08.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
08.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201104   M06   Fee paid on   08.09.2011
31.08.201205   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2006034275  (AQUARIUM PHARMA [US], et al) [X] 1-5,11,12,14,16,17 * paragraphs [0006] - [0008] - [0039] , [0041] , [0043] - [0048] * * figures 7-11 *;
 [X]US6106709  (BRESOLIN VALERIO [IT]) [X] 1-3,11,12,14 * column 3, lines 1-9,61-63 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]US3513978  (NEWSTEDER ROBERT) [A] 1,3-6,11,12,14,16-18 * column 3, line 68 - column 4, line 64 * * figures 6,7 *
by applicantUS6106709
 WO2006034275