Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2028671

EP2028671 - Circuit breaker having automatic release linkage [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.03.2014
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2014No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.04.2014  [2014/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LS Industrial Systems Co., Ltd
1026-6 Hogye-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si
Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR
[2009/09]
Inventor(s)01 / Ahn, Kil Young
205-102 Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong, Yuseong-gu
305-761 Daejeon / KR
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Karlsson, Leif Karl Gunnar
L.A. Groth & Co. KB
Box 6107
102 32 Stockholm / SE
[2013/19]
Former [2009/27]Karlsson, Leif Karl Gunnar
L.A. Groth & Co. KB Box 6107
102 32 Stockholm / SE
Former [2009/09]Karlsson, Leif Karl Gunnar
Groth & Co. KB Box 6107
102 32 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date08162539.418.08.2008
[2009/09]
Priority number, dateKR2007008333020.08.2007         Original published format: KR 20070083330
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2028671
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2028671
Date:28.04.2010
[2010/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2028671
Date:08.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.03.2010
ClassificationInternational:H01H77/10
[2012/51]
Former International [2010/17]H01H3/46, H01H71/50
Former International [2009/09]H01H3/46
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2011/01]
Former [2009/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Schalter mit automatischer Freigabeverbindung[2009/09]
English:Circuit breaker having automatic release linkage[2009/09]
French:Disjoncteur disposant d'une liaison de libération automatique[2009/09]
Examination procedure16.08.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.08.2010Examination requested  [2010/38]
29.10.2010Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
06.12.2010Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
19.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.08.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.06.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.03.2013Fee for grant paid
26.03.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.04.2011
Opposition(s)11.02.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
19.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
20.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]US4760224  (GENBA YASUSI [JP]) [X] 1 * column 5, lines 7-30; figures 4,5,7 * [I] 2-6;
 [A]US6018284  (RIVAL MARC [FR], et al) [A] 1 * column 7, lines 6-11 *