Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2028545

EP2028545 - Lens replacing method and manufacturing method for alternative lens [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  30.11.2012
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2012Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 02.01.2013  [2013/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
[2009/09]
Inventor(s)01 / Moizumi, Jun
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP
02 / Koizumi, Ryo
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Hitching, Peter Matthew , et al
Canon Europe Ltd
European Patent Department
3 The Square
Stockley Park
Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/36]Hitching, Peter Matthew , et al
Canon Europe Ltd 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex
UB11 1ET / GB
Former [2009/31]Sharp, Alan Cooper
Canon Europe Ltd. European Patent Department 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Uxbridge
UB11 1JA / GB
Former [2009/09]Sharp, Alan Cooper
Canon Europe Ltd. European Patent Department 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Uxbridge
Middlesex UB11 1JA / GB
Application number, filing date08162675.620.08.2008
[2009/09]
Priority number, dateJP2007021382420.08.2007         Original published format: JP 2007213824
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2028545
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:G03F7/20
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   NL [2009/44]
Former [2009/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Linsenaustauschverfahren und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Alternativlinse[2009/09]
English:Lens replacing method and manufacturing method for alternative lens[2009/09]
French:Procédé de remplacement de lentille et procédé de fabrication pour une lentille alternative[2009/09]
Examination procedure25.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/46]
23.11.2012Application withdrawn by applicant  [2013/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US2006187430  (DODOC AURELIAN [DE], et al) [A] 1,8 * abstract * * figures 1,13 * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0133] - paragraph [0135] *;
 [AD]JP2006287140  (NIPPON KOGAKU KK) [AD] 1,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0026] *;
 [A]JP2006073687  (NIPPON KOGAKU KK) [A] 1,8 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0039] *;
 [A]US2004169836  (WEGMANN ULRICH [DE]) [A] 1,8 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0057] *
by applicantJP2006287140
 JP2005268412
 JP2003029117