Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1988685

EP1988685 - Service provisioning in a communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.08.2014
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
[2014/24]
Former [2008/45]For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / Westman, IIkka
Keuruuntie 3-13 E21
FIN-00510, Helsinki / FI
02 / Bajko, Gabor
Nagyszalonta U. 6B
1202 Budapest / HU
03 / Huotari, Seppo
Albergan Esplanadi 4 B 31
FIN-02600, Espoo / FI
04 / Kiss, Krisztian
12278 Scipps Summit Dr.
San Diego, CA / US
05 / Pulkkinen, Olli M.
Alaniementie 6
FIN-02970, Espoo / FI
06 / Tammi, Kalle
Horsmapolku 1 G 13
37150 Nokia / FI
07 / Tuohino, Markku
Koivusyrja 25F
FIN-02130, Espoo / FI
 [2013/24]
Former [2008/51]01 / Westman, IIkka
Keuruuntie 3-13 E21
FIN-00510, Helsinki / FI
02 / Bajko, Gabor
Nagyszalonta U. 6B
1202 Budapest / HU
03 / Huotari, Seppo
Albergan Esplanadi 4 B 31
FIN-02600, Espoo / FI
04 / KIss, Krisztian
12278 Scipps Summit Dr.
San Diego, CA / US
05 / Pulkkinen, Olli M.
Alaniementie 6
FIN-02970, Espoo / FI
06 / Tammi, Kalle
Horsmapolku 1 G 13
37150 Nokia / FI
07 / Tuohino, Markku
Koivusyrja 25F
FIN-02130, Espoo / FI
Former [2008/45]01 / Westman, IIkka
Keuruuntie 3-13 E21
FIN-00510, Helsinki / FI
02 / Bajko, Gabor
City Gate 2 4th Floor
Budapest / HU
03 / Huotari, Seppo
Albergan Esplanadi 4 B 31
FIN-02600, Espoo / FI
04 / KIss, Krisztian
12278 Scipps Summit Dr.
San Diego, CA / US
05 / Pulkkinen, Olli M.
Alaniementie 6
FIN-02970, Espoo / FI
06 / Tammi, Kalle
Vernissaraitti 8 A 9
FIN-33720, Tampere / FI
07 / Tuohino, Markku
Koivusyrja 25F
FIN-02130, Espoo / FI
Representative(s)Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/43]Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London
WC1N 2BF / GB
Former [2008/45]Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London, WC1N 2BF / GB
Application number, filing date08162763.024.03.2004
[2008/45]
Priority number, dateGB2003000686325.03.2003         Original published format: GB 0306863
US2003061542009.07.2003         Original published format: US 615420
[2008/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1988685
Date:05.11.2008
Language:EN
[2008/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1988685
Date:25.07.2012
Language:EN
[2012/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1988685
Date:23.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.06.2012
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06
[2008/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/45]
TitleGerman:Dienstanbietung in einem Kommunikationssystem[2008/45]
English:Service provisioning in a communication system[2008/45]
French:Fourniture de service dans un système de télécommunication[2008/45]
Examination procedure25.01.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.01.2013Examination requested  [2013/10]
16.05.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.2013Fee for grant paid
10.09.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04722922.4  / EP1609322
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040722922) is  06.06.2007
Opposition(s)24.07.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
21.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
21.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
21.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
15.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
14.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
11.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.10.2013
BE23.10.2013
BG23.10.2013
CY23.10.2013
CZ23.10.2013
DK23.10.2013
EE23.10.2013
ES23.10.2013
FI23.10.2013
IT23.10.2013
MC23.10.2013
RO23.10.2013
SE23.10.2013
SI23.10.2013
SK23.10.2013
TR23.10.2013
GR24.01.2014
PT24.02.2014
GB24.03.2014
IE24.03.2014
LU24.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
FR31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/28]AT23.10.2013
BE23.10.2013
BG23.10.2013
CY23.10.2013
CZ23.10.2013
DK23.10.2013
EE23.10.2013
ES23.10.2013
FI23.10.2013
IT23.10.2013
MC23.10.2013
RO23.10.2013
SE23.10.2013
SI23.10.2013
SK23.10.2013
GR24.01.2014
PT24.02.2014
GB24.03.2014
IE24.03.2014
LU24.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
FR31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2016/27]AT23.10.2013
BE23.10.2013
BG23.10.2013
CY23.10.2013
CZ23.10.2013
DK23.10.2013
EE23.10.2013
ES23.10.2013
FI23.10.2013
IT23.10.2013
MC23.10.2013
RO23.10.2013
SE23.10.2013
SI23.10.2013
SK23.10.2013
PT24.02.2014
GB24.03.2014
IE24.03.2014
LU24.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
FR31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2016/25]AT23.10.2013
BE23.10.2013
BG23.10.2013
CY23.10.2013
CZ23.10.2013
DK23.10.2013
EE23.10.2013
ES23.10.2013
FI23.10.2013
IT23.10.2013
RO23.10.2013
SE23.10.2013
SI23.10.2013
SK23.10.2013
PT24.02.2014
GB24.03.2014
IE24.03.2014
LU24.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
FR31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2015/14]AT23.10.2013
BE23.10.2013
CY23.10.2013
CZ23.10.2013
DK23.10.2013
EE23.10.2013
ES23.10.2013
FI23.10.2013
IT23.10.2013
RO23.10.2013
SE23.10.2013
SI23.10.2013
SK23.10.2013
PT24.02.2014
GB24.03.2014
IE24.03.2014
LU24.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
FR31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2015/09]AT23.10.2013
BE23.10.2013
CY23.10.2013
CZ23.10.2013
DK23.10.2013
EE23.10.2013
ES23.10.2013
FI23.10.2013
IT23.10.2013
RO23.10.2013
SE23.10.2013
SK23.10.2013
PT24.02.2014
GB24.03.2014
IE24.03.2014
LU24.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
FR31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2015/08]AT23.10.2013
BE23.10.2013
CY23.10.2013
CZ23.10.2013
DK23.10.2013
EE23.10.2013
ES23.10.2013
FI23.10.2013
IT23.10.2013
RO23.10.2013
SE23.10.2013
SK23.10.2013
PT24.02.2014
IE24.03.2014
LU24.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
FR31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2015/07]AT23.10.2013
BE23.10.2013
CY23.10.2013
CZ23.10.2013
DK23.10.2013
EE23.10.2013
ES23.10.2013
FI23.10.2013
IT23.10.2013
RO23.10.2013
SE23.10.2013
SK23.10.2013
PT24.02.2014
IE24.03.2014
LU24.03.2014
Former [2014/48]AT23.10.2013
BE23.10.2013
CY23.10.2013
CZ23.10.2013
DK23.10.2013
EE23.10.2013
ES23.10.2013
FI23.10.2013
IT23.10.2013
RO23.10.2013
SE23.10.2013
SK23.10.2013
PT24.02.2014
LU24.03.2014
Former [2014/41]AT23.10.2013
BE23.10.2013
CY23.10.2013
CZ23.10.2013
DK23.10.2013
EE23.10.2013
ES23.10.2013
FI23.10.2013
IT23.10.2013
RO23.10.2013
SE23.10.2013
SK23.10.2013
PT24.02.2014
Former [2014/38]AT23.10.2013
BE23.10.2013
CY23.10.2013
CZ23.10.2013
EE23.10.2013
ES23.10.2013
FI23.10.2013
IT23.10.2013
RO23.10.2013
SE23.10.2013
SK23.10.2013
PT24.02.2014
Former [2014/37]AT23.10.2013
BE23.10.2013
CY23.10.2013
CZ23.10.2013
EE23.10.2013
ES23.10.2013
FI23.10.2013
RO23.10.2013
SE23.10.2013
SK23.10.2013
PT24.02.2014
Former [2014/36]AT23.10.2013
BE23.10.2013
CY23.10.2013
EE23.10.2013
ES23.10.2013
FI23.10.2013
SE23.10.2013
PT24.02.2014
Former [2014/28]AT23.10.2013
BE23.10.2013
CY23.10.2013
ES23.10.2013
FI23.10.2013
SE23.10.2013
PT24.02.2014
Former [2014/26]AT23.10.2013
BE23.10.2013
CY23.10.2013
ES23.10.2013
FI23.10.2013
SE23.10.2013
Former [2014/24]AT23.10.2013
BE23.10.2013
ES23.10.2013
FI23.10.2013
SE23.10.2013
Former [2014/23]BE23.10.2013
FI23.10.2013
SE23.10.2013
Former [2014/22]FI23.10.2013
SE23.10.2013
Documents cited:Search[A]WO0209365  (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-29 * abstract * * page 1, line 26 - page 2, line 14 * * page 3, paragraph 4 * * page 9, line 15 - line 32 * * page 18, line 28 - page 20, line 28 * * page 23, line 17 - page 24, line 17 *
 [XI]  - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+); Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); IP Multimedia Call Control Protocol based on SIP and SDP; Stage 3 (3GPP TS 24.229 version 5.3.0 Release 5); ETSI TS 124 229", ETSI STANDARDS, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE, SOPHIA-ANTIPO, FR, (200212), vol. 3-CN1, no. V530, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014008075 [X] 1,15,16,22,26 * page 21, paragraph 8 * * section 5.2.6.3; page 30 - page 31 * * page 28, paragraph 14 * * section 5.7.3; page 59 - page 60 * * section 5.4.3.1; page 49 - page 50 * [I] 2-14,17-21,23-25,27-29
 [A]  - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+); Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); IP Multimedia (IM) session handling; IM call model; Stage 2 (3GPP TS 23.218 version 5.3.0 Release 5); ETSI TS 123 218", ETSI STANDARDS, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE, SOPHIA-ANTIPO, FR, (200212), vol. 3-CN1, no. V530, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014007859 [A] 1-29 * page 12 - page 14 * * page 15, paragraph 6.2 - page 17, paragraph 6.5 * * page 25, paragraph 9.1.1.2 * * page 41, paragraph B.2.2 * * page 27, paragraph l - page 28, paragraph f *