Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2028160

EP2028160 - Modular floating helophyt filter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.07.2013
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.08.2013  [2013/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bright Water Company B.V.
Hellingstraat 22 L
1271 VA Huizen / NL
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
Bright Water Company B.V.
Hellingstraat 22 1
1271 VA Huizen / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Siers, Matthijs Geert
Bij den Toren 14
1251 JW Laren (NH) / NL
 [2009/16]
Former [2009/09]01 / Siers, Matthijs, Geert
Melkweg 34
1251 PS Laren (NH) / NL
Representative(s)Hatzmann, Martin , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]Hatzmann, Martin , et al
Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date08162785.321.08.2008
[2009/09]
Priority number, dateNL2007103428524.08.2007         Original published format: NL 1034285
[2009/09]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2028160
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2028160
Date:03.06.2009
[2009/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.05.2009
ClassificationInternational:C02F3/32
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
TitleGerman:Flössbarer und modularer Helophytfilter[2009/09]
English:Modular floating helophyt filter[2009/09]
French:Filtre d'helophytes modulaire et flottable[2009/09]
Examination procedure30.11.2009Examination requested  [2010/02]
06.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.11.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.09.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/35]
09.04.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2013/35]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.05.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
15.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201205   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5618413  (TODD JOHN H [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 5 - column 8 * * figure 6 *;
 [A]DE20118272U  (UMWELTSCHUTZ NORD GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2005115129  (FOUNTAINHEAD LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5507950  (SENDA SHOHEI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantJPH10113686
 US5618413
 JPH1028990
 JPH09314180
 JPH0929283
 JPH081188
 JP2003112191
 JP2002001387
 JPH10258299
 JPH10165019
 JPH10113685
 JPH0956279
 JPH08155477
 JPH06226288
 GB2411396