Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023157

EP2023157 - Multiple-target radar recognition method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.08.2012
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SELEX Galileo S.p.A.
Via A. Einstein 35
CAMPI BISENZIO (FI) / IT
[2010/09]
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Galileo Avionica S.p.A.
Via A. Einstein 35
50013 Campi Bisenzio (Firenze) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Aprile, Angelo
Via Marconi, 105/D
27010, GIUSSAGO / IT
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Jorio, Paolo , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Jorio, Paolo , et al
STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date08162878.621.12.2006
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2023157
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2023157
Date:11.03.2009
[2009/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2023157
Date:12.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2009
ClassificationInternational:G01S13/90, G01S7/41
[2009/11]
Former International [2009/07]G01S13/90
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
TitleGerman:Mehrziel-Radarerkennungsverfahren und -vorrichtung[2009/07]
English:Multiple-target radar recognition method and apparatus[2009/07]
French:Procédé et appareil de reconnaissance par radar à cibles multiples[2009/07]
Examination procedure10.09.2009Examination requested  [2009/44]
15.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.07.2011Fee for grant paid
07.07.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06425852.8  / EP1936402
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060425852) is  03.02.2009
Opposition(s)13.07.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
16.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.10.2011
BE12.10.2011
CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
FI12.10.2011
HU12.10.2011
IT12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
TR12.10.2011
IE21.12.2011
LU21.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
ES23.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
DE03.07.2012
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT12.10.2011
BE12.10.2011
CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
FI12.10.2011
IT12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
TR12.10.2011
IE21.12.2011
LU21.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
ES23.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
DE03.07.2012
Former [2013/29]AT12.10.2011
BE12.10.2011
CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
FI12.10.2011
IT12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
IE21.12.2011
LU21.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
ES23.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
DE03.07.2012
Former [2013/25]AT12.10.2011
BE12.10.2011
CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
IT12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
IE21.12.2011
LU21.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
ES23.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
DE03.07.2012
Former [2013/22]AT12.10.2011
BE12.10.2011
CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
IT12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
IE21.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
ES23.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
DE03.07.2012
Former [2013/07]AT12.10.2011
BE12.10.2011
CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
IT12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
IE21.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
DE03.07.2012
Former [2012/49]BE12.10.2011
CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
IT12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
IE21.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
DE03.07.2012
Former [2012/47]BE12.10.2011
CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
IT12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
IE21.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
DE03.07.2012
Former [2012/37]BE12.10.2011
CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
IT12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
MC31.12.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/36]BE12.10.2011
CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
MC31.12.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/35]BE12.10.2011
CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
MC31.12.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/34]BE12.10.2011
CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
MC31.12.2011
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/28]BE12.10.2011
CY12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/24]BE12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/23]BE12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/21]BE12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
IS12.02.2012
Former [2012/20]LT12.10.2011
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0947851  (DAIMLERCHRYSLER AEROSPACE AG [DE]) [Y] 1,13 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0009] - [0014] - [0024]; figure - *;
 [A]US6337654  (RICHARDSON DENNIS W [US], et al) [A] 1,13 * column 7, line 5 - column 8, line 32; figure -; claims 1-5 *;
 [A]US6529157  (MENSA DEAN L [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [Y]  LUO ET AL, "ISAR Imaging of Multiple Targets Based on Adaptive Gaussian Chirplet Decomposition", PROCEEDINGS OF 2006 CIE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON RADAR, Shanghai, China 2006, IEEE Piscataway, NJ, USA, (20061016), pages 1 - 4, XP002448204 [Y] 1,13 * paragraphs [000I] , [00II] , [00IV] , [000V] *
 [A]  WANG A ET AL, "IMAGING OF MULTITARGETS WITH ISAR BASED ON THE TIME-FREQUENCY DISTRIBUTION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP) S. STATISTICAL SIGNAL AND ARRAY PROCESSING. ADELAIDE, APR. 19 - 22, 1994; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PRO, (19940419), vol. 5, ISBN 978-0-7803-1776-5, pages V - 173, XP000533715 [A] 1-13 * paragraph [000I] *