Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2034399

EP2034399 - Scrolling method of mobile terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.05.2019
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.01.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IS, IT
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128 Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-Gu
07336 SEOUL / KR
[2019/23]
Former [2009/11]For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20 Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Kwak, Woo-Young
Byucksan 1 Cha Apt. 354-1404, 43/4, 884-4
Jeongja 2-Dong
Jangan-Gu, Suwon Gyeonggi-Do / KR
02 / Lee, Seung-Jun
Samsung Raemian 4-Cha Apt. 423-803
42, Dangsandong 5-Ga
Yeongdeungpo-Gu Seoul / KR
03 / Park, So-Young
Hyundai Apt. 103-1805
Namgajwa Dong, Seodaemun-Gu
Seoul / KR
 [2019/23]
Former [2009/11]01 / Kwak, Woo-Young
Byucksan 1 Cha Apt. 354-1404, 43/4, 884-4 Jeongja 2-Dong
Jangan-Gu, Suwon Gyeonggi-Do / KR
02 / Lee, Seung-Jun
Samsung Raemian 4-Cha Apt. 423-803 42, Dangsandong 5-Ga
Yeongdeungpo-Gu Seoul / KR
03 / Park, So-Young
Hyundai Apt. 103-1805 Namgajwa Dong, Seodaemun-Gu
Seoul / KR
Representative(s)Plasseraud IP
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2019/23]Cabinet Plasseraud
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2009/11]Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date08163512.002.09.2008
[2009/11]
Priority number, dateKR2007008967004.09.2007         Original published format: KR 20070089670
KR2007008968604.09.2007         Original published format: KR 20070089686
[2009/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2034399
Date:11.03.2009
Language:EN
[2009/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2034399
Date:12.12.2012
Language:EN
[2012/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2034399
Date:05.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.11.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/0485, G06F3/0488, G06F3/0482
[2019/04]
Former International [2009/11]G06F3/048
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2019/23]
Former [2009/11]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Verschiebung der Anzeige eines mobilen Endgeräts[2010/42]
English:Scrolling method of mobile terminal[2009/11]
French:Méthode de défilement pour un terminal mobile[2010/42]
Former [2009/11]Rollverfahren für ein mobiles Endgerät
Former [2009/11]Procédé de défilement d'un terminal mobile
Examination procedure02.09.2008Examination requested  [2009/11]
12.06.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.04.2019Fee for grant paid
19.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.09.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
20.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
20.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
26.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
25.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
22.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
26.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
25.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
EE05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
IT05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
SK05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
IS05.10.2019
PT07.10.2019
[2020/12]
Former [2020/11]AT05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
EE05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
SK05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
PT07.10.2019
Former [2020/10]AT05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
PT07.10.2019
Former [2020/09]CZ05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
Former [2020/07]ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
Former [2019/51]ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
Former [2019/50]ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
Former [2019/49]ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
NO05.09.2019
Former [2019/48]ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
NO05.09.2019
Former [2019/47]ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
NO05.09.2019
Documents cited:Search[X]US2007146337  (ORDING BAS [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0062]; figures 6,7A-C *;
 [XA]EP0971285  (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,6,15 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0035]; figures 3-5 * [A] 12;
 [XA]US2007067328  (MINGOT JACQUES [FR], et al) [X] 6,15 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0053]; figures 9-11 * [A] 1-3,7,11-14;
 [XA]US6366302  (CROSBY SHELIA RENEE [US], et al) [X] 6 * column 5, line 20 - column 7, line 25; figure 3 * * column 10, line 61 - column 11, line 46; figure 16 * [A] 1-3,7,11-15