Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2166483

EP2166483 - Method and device for creating a digital signature [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.08.2016
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.09.2016  [2016/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gemalto AB
Gotalandsvagen 230
Hus 22 - Box 42133
125 44 Alvsjo Stockholm / SE
[2015/21]
Former [2010/12]For all designated states
TDS TODOS DATA SYSTEM AB
Fiskhamnsgatan 2
414 58 Göteborg / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Gullberg, Peter
Tanneskärsgatan 259
421 60, Västra Frölunda / SE
 [2010/12]
Representative(s)Scheer, Luc , et al
Thales Dis France SA
Intellectual Property Department
525, avenue du Pic de Bertagne
CS12023
13881 Gémenos Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2010/12]Fritsche, Daniel , et al
Awapatent AB Box 11394
404 28 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date08164506.117.09.2008
[2010/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2166483
Date:24.03.2010
Language:EN
[2010/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/24, H04L9/32
[2010/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/12]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erstellung einer digitalen Unterschrift[2010/12]
English:Method and device for creating a digital signature[2010/12]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour créer une signature numérique[2010/12]
Examination procedure15.09.2010Examination requested  [2010/43]
26.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/38]
29.04.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2016/38]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.10.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
08.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
07.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
23.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
24.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201508   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0228005  (SIEMENS AG OESTERREICH [AT]) [X] 1-15 * page 8 - page 11 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [X]WO0195070  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]; LINDSKOG HELENA [SE]; NILSSON MIKAEL [SE) [X] 1-15 * page 4 - page 9 *;
 [A]EP1662699  (RICOH KK [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0050] *