Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2100950

EP2100950 - Automatic dishwashing detergent composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.03.2015
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
06.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2015/16]
Former [2009/38]For all designated states
The Procter and Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Souter, Philip Frank
The Nook The Green
Longhorsley
Morpeth Newcastle upon Tyne Northumberland NE65 8UP / GB
 [2015/16]
Former [2009/38]01 / Souter, Philip Frank
The Nook The Green Longhorsley
Morpeth Newcastle upon Tyne Northumberland NE65 8UP / GB
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/16]Yorquez Ramirez, Maria Isabel
Procter & Gamble
Technical Centres Limited
Whitley Road
Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB
Former [2010/50]Samuels, Lucy Alice , et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London
EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2009/38]Peet, Jillian Wendy
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne
NE12 9TS / GB
Application number, filing date08164651.518.09.2008
[2009/38]
Priority number, dateEP2008015275814.03.2008         Original published format: EP 08152758
[2009/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2100950
Date:16.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2100950
Date:15.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:C11D3/386
[2014/43]
Former International [2009/38]C11D3/386, // C11D17/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/16]
Former [2009/38]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Automatische Spülmaschinen-Tensidzusammensetzung[2009/38]
English:Automatic dishwashing detergent composition[2009/38]
French:Composition de détergent de lave-vaisselle automatique[2009/38]
Examination procedure08.03.2010Examination requested  [2010/15]
31.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.11.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
01.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
23.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.02.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.03.2015Fee for grant paid
04.03.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.03.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.03.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  14.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Kennedydamm 55 / Roßstrasse
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  15.01.2016  18.02.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Dalli-Werke GmbH & Co. KG
Zweifaller Strasse 120
52224 Stolberg / DE
Opponent's representative
f & e patent
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 03  15.01.2016  18.08.2017  WITHDRAWN
Reckitt Benckiser Finish B.V.
Siriusdreef 14
2132 WT Hoofddorp / NL
Opponent's representative
Hewett, Erica Louise, et al
Reckitt Benckiser
Corporate Services Limited
Legal Department - Patents Group
Dansom Lane
Hull, East Yorkshire HU8 7DS / GB
 [2017/39]
Former [2017/34]
Opponent(s)01  14.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Kennedydamm 55 / Roßstrasse
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  15.01.2016  18.02.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Dalli-Werke GmbH & Co. KG
Zweifaller Strasse 120
52224 Stolberg / DE
Opponent's representative
f & e patent
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 03  15.01.2016  18.02.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Reckitt Benckiser Finish B.V.
Siriusdreef 14
2132 WT Hoofddorp / NL
Opponent's representative
Hewett, Erica Louise, et al
Reckitt Benckiser
Corporate Services Limited
Legal Department - Patents Group
Dansom Lane
Hull, East Yorkshire HU8 7DS / GB
Former [2016/20]
Opponent(s)01  14.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  15.01.2016  18.02.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Dalli-Werke GmbH & Co. KG
Zweifaller Strasse 120
52224 Stolberg / DE
Opponent's representative
f & e patent
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 03  15.01.2016  18.02.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Reckitt Benckiser Finish B.V.
Siriusdreef 14
2132 WT Hoofddorp / NL
Opponent's representative
Hewett, Erica Louise, et al
Reckitt Benckiser
Corporate Services Limited
Legal Department - Patents Group
Dansom Lane
Hull, East Yorkshire HU8 7DS / GB
Former [2016/08]
Opponent(s)01  14.01.2016   
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Stevermann, Birgit
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA VTP Patente
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  15.01.2016   
Dalli-Werke GmbH & Co. KG
Zweifaller Strasse 120
52224 Stolberg / DE
Opponent's representative
f & e patent
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 03  15.01.2016   
Reckitt Benckiser Finish B.V.
Siriusdreef 14
2132 WT Hoofddorp / NL
Opponent's representative
Hewett, Erica Louise, et al
Reckitt Benckiser
Corporate Services Limited
Legal Department - Patents Group
Dansom Lane
Hull, East Yorkshire HU8 7DS / GB
26.02.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.09.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.09.2017Date of oral proceedings
08.11.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
08.11.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition20.12.2017Appeal received No.  T2661/17
13.03.2018Statement of grounds filed
08.12.2017Appeal received No.  T2661/17
08.03.2018Statement of grounds filed
16.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
01.02.2011Request for further processing filed
01.02.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.02.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
08.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
09.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
08.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.09.2008
AT15.04.2015
BE15.04.2015
BG15.04.2015
CY15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
MT15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
SE15.04.2015
SI15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
IE18.09.2015
LU18.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
[2017/39]
Former [2017/22]AT15.04.2015
BE15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
MT15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
SI15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
IE18.09.2015
LU18.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
Former [2016/37]AT15.04.2015
BE15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
SI15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
IE18.09.2015
LU18.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
Former [2016/33]AT15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
SI15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
IE18.09.2015
LU18.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
Former [2016/24]AT15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
SI15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
LU18.09.2015
Former [2016/23]AT15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
LU18.09.2015
Former [2016/21]AT15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
LU18.09.2015
Former [2016/10]AT15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2016/09]AT15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2016/07]AT15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2015/51]AT15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2015/50]FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2015/49]FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2015/42]NL15.04.2015
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0242408  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,3-12 * page 47 - page 49 * * page 24, line 10 - page 31, line 8 *;
 [X]WO9963040  (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,5-12 * page 2, line 18 - page 3, line 20; example 2 *;
 [X]DE102005062984  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2008010925  (DANISCO US INC GENENCOR DIV [US], et al) [A] 3,4 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] *;
 [L]WO9102792  (HENKEL RESEARCH CORP [US]) [L] *Completes the disclosure of WO9963040 with respect to the Bacillus lentus protease referred to on p. 2, l. 18-20.*;; figure 29 *;
 [A]WO0210355  (NOVOZYMES AS [DK]) [A] 1 * page 12, line 1 - line 4; sequence 13 * * page 13, line 1 - line 5; figure 1 * * page 33, line 15 - page 34, line 4 *
 [A]  - "Stainzyme: a breakthrough in dishwashing performance", FOCUS ON SURFACTANTS, ELSEVIER, (20041201), vol. 2004, no. 12, ISSN 1351-4210, page 3, XP004699512 [A] 1,2,12 * the whole document *
 [A]  - "The detergent that lets customers save as they wash", FOCUS ON SURFACTANTS, ELSEVIER, (20070901), vol. 2007, no. 9, ISSN 1351-4210, page 5, XP022302950 [A] 1-4 * the whole document *
 [A]  - AEHLE W, Enzymes in industry, WILEY-VCH VERLAG, (2007), ISBN 978-3-527-31689-2, XP002489592 [A] 1-12 * page 178 - page 193 *
Examination   - Tramper J and Poulsen P B, "Enzymes as processing aids and final products", Tramper J and Poulsen P B, Straathof A J J and Adlercreutz P, Applied Biocatalysis, Harwood Academic Publishers, (2005), pages 62 - 102, ISBN 90-5823-024-4
by applicantUS6939702
 WO2007145964
 WO9422800
 US6426229
 WO9501416
 GB1466799
 US4246612
 US5227084
 US5114611
 US4810410
 WO9906521
 WO9426860
 WO9426859
 WO02102955
 US4765916
 US4972017
 WO9529982
 WO2004111178
 WO0208380
    - NEEDLEMAN, S. B.; WUNSCH, C. D., J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, pages 443 - 453