Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2169690

EP2169690 - Pressure compensator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.07.2012
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
29.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB Schweiz AG
Brown Boveri Strasse 6
5400 Baden / CH
[2017/16]
Former [2010/13]For all designated states
ABB Technology AG
Affoltern Strasse 44
8050 Zürich / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Virtanen, Esa
Välikatu 7
65100, Vaasa / FI
02 / Haldin, Torvald
Karlebyvägen 1616 B
66580, Kuni / FI
03 / Missing, Kim
Jokivarsitie 899
66510, Merikaarto / FI
 [2012/35]
Former [2010/13]01 / Virtanen, Esa
Välikatu 7
65100, Vaasa / FI
02 / Haldin, Torvald
Karlebyvägen 1616 B
66580, Kuni / FI
03 / Missing, Kim
Jokivarsitie 899
66510, Merikaarto / FI
Representative(s)Peterreins Schley
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Hermann-Sack-Strasse 3
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/01]Peterreins, Frank
Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8
80807 München / DE
Former [2013/43]Kolster Oy Ab
Iso Roobertinkatu 23
PO Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
Former [2012/35]Valkeiskangas, Tapio Lassi Paavali
Kolster Oy Ab
Iso Roobertinkatu 23
P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
Former [2010/13]Valkeiskangas, Tapio Lassi Paavali
Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date08164976.624.09.2008
[2010/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2169690
Date:31.03.2010
Language:EN
[2010/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2169690
Date:29.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.03.2009
ClassificationInternational:H01F27/14, E21B33/038
[2012/16]
Former International [2010/13]H01F27/14
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/13]
TitleGerman:Druckkompensator[2010/13]
English:Pressure compensator[2010/13]
French:Compensateur de pression[2010/13]
Examination procedure25.08.2010Examination requested  [2010/40]
12.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.07.2012Fee for grant paid
18.07.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.10.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.05.2013  26.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1
80333 München / DE
 [2017/50]
Former [2013/28]
Opponent(s)01  29.05.2013   
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
05.07.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.01.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.04.2015Date of oral proceedings
05.06.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.06.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition31.07.2015Appeal received No.  T1546/15
05.10.2015Statement of grounds filed
14.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
22.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU24.09.2008
AT29.08.2012
BE29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
IT29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
MT29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
TR29.08.2012
IE24.09.2012
LU24.09.2012
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
BG29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT29.08.2012
BE29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
IT29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
MT29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
TR29.08.2012
IE24.09.2012
LU24.09.2012
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
BG29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
Former [2014/21]AT29.08.2012
BE29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
IT29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
MT29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
TR29.08.2012
IE24.09.2012
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
BG29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
Former [2013/51]AT29.08.2012
BE29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
IT29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
MT29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
IE24.09.2012
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
BG29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
Former [2013/34]AT29.08.2012
BE29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
IT29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
IE24.09.2012
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
BG29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
Former [2013/33]AT29.08.2012
BE29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
IT29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
IE24.09.2012
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
Former [2013/23]AT29.08.2012
BE29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
IT29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
MC30.09.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
Former [2013/22]AT29.08.2012
BE29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
MC30.09.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
Former [2013/21]AT29.08.2012
BE29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
MC30.09.2012
GR30.11.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
Former [2013/20]AT29.08.2012
BE29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
MC30.09.2012
GR30.11.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
Former [2013/13]AT29.08.2012
BE29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
GR30.11.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
Former [2013/12]AT29.08.2012
BE29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
GR30.11.2012
IS29.12.2012
Former [2013/11]AT29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
GR30.11.2012
IS29.12.2012
Former [2013/10]AT29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
IS29.12.2012
Former [2013/09]AT29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
Former [2013/08]AT29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
Former [2013/07]AT29.08.2012
Documents cited:Search[X]US2007074872  (DU MICHAEL H [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11-13 * claims 1-3,5-11,13-15 * * paragraphs [0005] , [0008] , [0079] * * figures 2-4 *;
 [Y]GB1023452  (BRUCE PEEBLES & CO LTD) [Y] 1,4,5,14,15 * claims 1-3,8 * * page 1, line 10 - line 82 * * page 2, line 1 - line 42 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [DY]WO2007055588  (NORSK HYDRO PRODUKSJON A S [NO], et al) [DY] 1,4,5,14,15 * claims 1,3 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]JPS56162815  (TAMURA SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] 1,9 * abstract *;
 [A]CN201054295Y  (SHIYOU JIANG [CN]) [A] 1,4,5,7,13-15 * abstract * * figure 1 *;
 [A]JPH06310343  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1,5,7 * abstract * * figures 3,4 *
by applicantWO2007055588
 US2004051615
 JPH09176766
 JP2000046181
 EP0281685
 US5893681