Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2172882

EP2172882 - Method of cigarette packaging and cigarette packaging system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  06.12.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.2019Refusal of applicationpublished on 08.01.2020  [2020/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JT International S.A.
8, rue Kazem Radjavi
1202 Geneva / CH
[2016/30]
Former [2010/14]For all designated states
JT International S.A.
1, Rue de la Gabelle
1211 Geneva 26 / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Schmitz, Reiner
Chemin des Suzettes 15
CH-1233 Bernex / CH
 [2010/14]
Representative(s)Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Postfach 44 01 51
80750 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/18]Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 44 01 51
80750 München / DE
Former [2010/14]Skuhra, Udo
Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstraße 31
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date08165904.706.10.2008
[2010/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2172882
Date:07.04.2010
Language:EN
[2010/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.02.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/00
[2010/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/14]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Zigarettenverpackung und Zigarettenverpackungssystem[2010/14]
English:Method of cigarette packaging and cigarette packaging system[2010/14]
French:Procédé et système de conditionnement de cigarettes[2010/14]
Examination procedure26.05.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.05.2009Examination requested  [2010/14]
17.11.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.2011Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.10.2011
11.10.2011Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
14.11.2011Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/02]
28.03.2019Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/02]
Appeal following examination03.01.2012Appeal received No.  T0907/12
14.03.2012Statement of grounds filed
28.03.2019Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
28.03.2019Date of oral proceedings
09.04.2019Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.11.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
31.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
31.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
30.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
31.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
25.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
24.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2005057378  (SAVI TECHN INC [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraphs 4-7 * * page 3, paragraph 10 - page 4, paragraph 12 * * page 7, paragraph 35 - page 8, paragraph 36 * * page 9, paragraph 41 * * page 12, paragraph 60 - page 13, paragraph 61 * * page 15, paragraph 72 - page 19, paragraph 88 * * page 19, paragraph 91 - page 20, paragraph 94 *;
 [X]US2007282716  (BRANIGAN JAMES PETER [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 4 - page 2, paragraph 12 * * page 2, paragraphs 23,24 * * page 3, paragraph 31 - page 4, paragraph 35 *;
 [X]WO2007011863  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 2, paragraph 6 * * page 5, paragraph 23 - page 6, paragraph 26 * * page 8, paragraph 31 * * page 10, paragraphs 38,40 * * page 11, paragraph 42 * * page 14, paragraph 53 - page 15, paragraph 55 *
by applicantUS2001032138
 EP1134679
 EP1645992
 DE19951140