Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2022800

EP2022800 - Compositions for the therapy and diagnosis of ovarian cancer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.01.2016
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.02.2016  [2016/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CORIXA CORPORATION
CSC, The United States Corporation 2711 Centerville Road
Wilmington, DE 19808 / US
[2010/28]
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
CORIXA CORPORATION
CSC The United States Corporation 2711 Centerville Road
Wilmington, DE 19808 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Mitcham, Jennifer L.
20330 NE 85th Street
Redmond, WA 98053 / US
02 / King, Gordon E.
15716 First Avenue N.W.
Shoreline, WA 98177 / US
03 / Algate, Paul A.
580 Kalmia Place N.W.
Issaquah, WA 98027 / US
04 / Fling, Steven P.
11414 Pinyon Avenue N.E.
Bainbridge, WA 98110 / US
05 / Retter, Marc W.
33402 N.E. 43rd Place
Carnation, WA 98014 / US
06 / Fanger, Gary Richard
15906 29th Drive S.E.
Mill Creek, WA 98012 / US
07 / Reed, Steven G.
2843 122nd Place N.E.
Bellevue, WA 98005 / US
08 / Vedvick, Thomas S.
124 S. 300th Place
Federal Way, WA 98003 / US
09 / Carter, Darrick
836 Northwest 64th
Seattle, WA 98107 / US
10 / Hill, Paul
4917 West View Drive
Everett, WA 98201 / US
11 / Albone, Earl
509 Launfall Road
Plymouth Meeting, PA 19462 / US
 [2009/29]
Former [2009/07]01 / Mitcham, Jennifer L.
16677 NE 88th Street
Redmone, PA 98052 / US
02 / King, Gordon E.
15716 First Avenue N.W.
Shoreline, WA 98177 / US
03 / Algate, Paul A.
580 Kalmia Place N.W.
Issaquah, WA 98027 / US
04 / Fling, Steven P.
11414 Pinyon Avenue N.E.
Bainbridge, WA 98110 / US
05 / Retter, Marc W.
33402 N.E. 43rd Place
Carnation, WA 98014 / US
06 / Fanger, Gary Richard
15906 29th Drive S.E.
Mill Creek, WA 98012 / US
07 / Reed, Steven G.
2843 122nd Place N.E.
Bellevue, WA 98005 / US
08 / Vedvick, Thomas S.
124 S. 300th Place
Federal Way, WA 98003 / US
09 / Carter, Darrick
321 Summit Avenue E.
Seattle, WA 98102 / US
10 / Hill, Paul
4917 West View Drive
Everett, WA 98201 / US
11 / Albone, Earl
509 Launfall Road
Plymouth Meeting, PA 19462 / US
Representative(s)Walker, Ross Thomson , et al
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/13]Walker, Ross Thomson , et al
Forrester & Boehmert
SkyGarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
Former [2009/07]Walker, Ross Thomson
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date08165934.417.07.2001
[2009/07]
Priority number, dateUS2000061774717.07.2000         Original published format: US 617747
US2000063680110.08.2000         Original published format: US 636801
US2000066785720.09.2000         Original published format: US 667857
US2001082727104.04.2001         Original published format: US 827271
US2001088444118.06.2001         Original published format: US 884441
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2022800
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2022800
Date:25.02.2009
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:C07K16/30, C07K14/705, C12N15/12, A61K39/00, A61K39/395, C07K19/00, A61P35/00
[2009/09]
Former International [2009/07]C07K16/30, A61K39/395, C07K14/705, C12N15/12, A61K39/00, C07K19/00, A61P35/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2009/07]
TitleGerman:Zusammensetzungen zur Behandlung und Diagnose von Eierstockkrebs[2009/07]
English:Compositions for the therapy and diagnosis of ovarian cancer[2009/07]
French:Compositions utilisés dans la thérapie et le diagnostic du cancer des ovaires[2009/07]
Examination procedure12.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/39]
10.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.10.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.04.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.08.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/06]
23.09.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/06]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP01954748.8  / EP1349870
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010954748) is  28.09.2004
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
31.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
31.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
31.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
28.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
26.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
25.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
25.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
29.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
28.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201515   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9963088  (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [X] 14 * page 188, line 29 - page 190 * * example 92 * * figures 207,208 * [Y] 9,12,13,18,19;
 [XY]WO0012758  (DIADEXUS LLC [US], et al) [X] 14 * page 14, line 5 - page 15, line 27 * * SEQ ID NO:1 * [Y] 9,12,13,18,19;
 [XY]WO0036107  (CORIXA CORP [US]) [X] 14 * pages 21-26 * * claims 31,50,63 * * page 133 - page 136 * [Y] 9,12,13,18,19;
 [E]WO0194641  (IDEC PHARMA CORP [US]) [E] 14 * figure 7b * * page 34, line 3 - page 38, line 17 *;
 [E]WO0202624  (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [E] 14 * figure 1 * * claims 18-35 * * example 4 *;
 [T]  - SALCEDA SUSANA ET AL, "The immunomodulatory protein B7-H4 is overexpressed in breast and ovarian cancers and promotes epithelial cell transformation.", EXPERIMENTAL CELL RESEARCH 15 MAY 2005, (20050515), vol. 306, no. 1, ISSN 0014-4827, pages 128 - 141, XP004876369 [T] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.yexcr.2005.01.018
 [T]  - SICA GABRIEL L ET AL, "B7-H4, a molecule of the B7 family, negatively regulates T cell immunity", IMMUNITY, CELL PRESS, US, (20030601), vol. 18, no. 6, ISSN 1074-7613, pages 849 - 861, XP002485368

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1074-7613(03)00152-3
 [T]  - ZANG X ET AL, "B7X: A WIDELY EXPRESSED B7 FAMILY MEMBER THAT INHIBITS T CELL ACTIVATION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC.; US, (20030902), vol. 100, no. 18, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 10388 - 10392, XP007900115

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1434299100
 [T]  - DURBAKA V R PRASAD ET AL, "B7S1, a novel B7 family member that negatively regulates T cell activation", IMMUNITY, CELL PRESS, US, (20030601), vol. 18, no. 6, ISSN 1074-7613, pages 863 - 873, XP002501204 [T] 1

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1074-7613(03)00147-X
by applicantWO9638591
 US4935233
 US4751180
 WO9118926
 US4671958
 US4489710
 US4625014
 US4638045
 US4569789
 US4507234
 US4699784
 US4429008
 US4873088
 US4735792
 US4673562
 US5240856
 US5215926
 WO8906280
 WO9116116
 WO9207243
 US4235877
 US4603112
 US4769330
 US5017487
 WO8901973
 US4777127
 GB2200651
 EP0345242
 WO9102805
 US4897268
 US5075109
 US4436727
 US4877611
 US4866034
 US4912094
 WO9602555
 WO9400153
 WO9633739
 WO9517210
 WO9724447
 US4918164
 WO9718300
 US5359681
    - LAGERSTROM ET AL., PCR METHODS APPLIC., (1991), vol. 1, pages 111 - 19
    - PARKER ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS. RES., (1991), vol. 19, pages 3055 - 60
    - SCHENA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 10614 - 10619
    - HELLER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 2150 - 2155
    - GIBSON ET AL., GENOME RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 6, pages 995 - 1001
    - HEID ET AL., GENOME RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 6, pages 986 - 994
    - ADELMAN ET AL., DNA, (1983), vol. 2, page 183
    - PAUL, Fundamental Immunology, RAVEN PRESS, (1993), pages 243 - 247
    - MERRIFIELD, J AM. CHEM. SOC., (1963), vol. 85, pages 2149 - 2146
    - MARATEA ET AL., GENE, (1985), vol. 40, pages 39 - 46
    - MURPHY ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1986), vol. 83, pages 8258 - 8262
    - STOUTE ET AL., NEW ENGL. J. MED., (1997), vol. 336, pages 86 - 91
    - BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 795 - 798
    - KOHLER; MILSTEIN, EUR. J. LMMUNOL., (1976), vol. 6, pages 511 - 519
    - CHEN ET AL., CANCER RES., (1994), vol. 54, pages 1065 - 1070
    - COLIGAN ET AL., Current Protocols in Immunology, WILEY INTERSCIENCE, (1998), vol. 1
    - CHANG ET AL., CRIT. REV. DNCOL. HEMATOL., (1996), vol. 22, page 213
    - FISHER-HOCH ET AL., PNAS, (1989), vol. 86, pages 317 - 321
    - FLEXNER ET AL., ANN. NY. ACAD. SCI., (1989), vol. 569, pages 86 - 103
    - FLEXNER ET AL., VACCINE, (1990), vol. 8, pages 17 - 21
    - BERKNER, BIOTECHNIQUES, (1988), vol. 6, pages 616 - 627
    - ROSENFELD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 252, pages 431 - 434
    - KOLLS ET AL., PNAS, (1994), vol. 91, pages 215 - 219
    - KASS-EISLER ET AL., PNAS, (1993), vol. 90, pages 11498 - 11502
    - GUZMAN ET AL., CIRCULATION, (1993), vol. 88, pages 2838 - 2848
    - GUZMAN ET AL., CIR. RES., (1993), vol. 73, pages 1202 - 1207
    - ULMER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 259, pages 1745 - 1749
    - COHEN, SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 259, pages 1691 - 1692
    - MOSMANN; COFFINAN, ANN. REV. IMMUNOL., (1989), vol. 7, pages 145 - 173
    - BANCHEREAU; STEINMAN, NATURE, (1998), vol. 392, pages 245 - 251
    - TIMMERMAN; LEVY, ANN. REV. MED, (1999), vol. 50, pages 507 - 529
    - ZITVOGEL ET AL., NATURE MED., (1998), vol. 4, pages 594 - 600
    - MAHVI ET AL., IMMUNOLOGY AND CELL BIOLOGY, (1997), vol. 75, pages 456 - 460
    - CHEEVER ET AL., IMMUNOLOGICAL REVIEWS, (1997), vol. 157, page 177
    - Pierce Immunotechnology Catalog and Handbook, (1991), pages A12 - A13
    - SACKETT ET AL., Clinical Epidemiology: A Basic Science for Clinical Medicine, LITTLE BROWN AND CO., (1985), pages 106 - 7
    - MULLIS ET AL., COLD SPRING HARBOR SYMP. QUANT. BIOL., (1987), vol. 51, page 263
    - SCHENA ET AL., FROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 10614 - 10619
    - JIN ET AL., CELL, (1998), vol. 93, pages 81 - 91
    - BOS, J. OF IMNUNOASSAY, (1981), vol. 2, pages 187 - 204
    - PARKER, K.C. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 152, no. 1, pages 163 - 175
    - PEREZ-VILAR; HILL, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, no. 45, pages 31751 - 31754