blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2028541

EP2028541 - Memory alteration system for camera and its control method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  12.06.2015
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.06.2015Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 15.07.2015  [2015/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
[2009/09]
Inventor(s)01 / HARADA, Yoshihito
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-cho
Tokyo Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date08166682.816.12.1998
[2009/09]
Priority number, dateJP1997034830417.12.1997         Original published format: JP 34830497
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2028541
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2028541
Date:16.02.2011
[2011/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.01.2011
ClassificationIPC:G03B7/091, G03B17/00
[2011/06]
CPC:
G03B17/00 (EP,US); G03B7/091 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2009/09]G03B7/091
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2011/42]
Former [2009/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Speicheränderungssystem für eine Kamera und deren Steuerverfahren[2009/09]
English:Memory alteration system for camera and its control method[2009/09]
French:Système d'altération de mémoire pour caméra et son procédé de contrôle[2009/09]
Examination procedure27.04.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.08.2011Examination requested  [2011/38]
17.08.2011Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
22.09.2011Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
10.02.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.06.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.2015Application withdrawn by applicant  [2015/29]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP98123919.7  / EP0924553
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980123919) is  09.06.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
16.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
16.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
16.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
16.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
16.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
16.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
16.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
16.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
04.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
03.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
02.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
02.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 15
02.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 16
05.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 17
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]JPH07191364  ;
 [A]US5300978  (MIYASAKA TETSUO [JP]) [A] 1-5 * figures 1,2; claims 1,2 *;
 [A]US5278604  (NAKAMURA KATSUNORI [JP]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *;
 [A]US4853733  (WATANABE YOUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * figure 1; claims 1,3 *
 [AD]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 1995, no. 10, & JP07191364 A 19950728 (NIKON CORP) [AD] 1-5 * abstract *
by applicantJPH07191364
 EP0924553
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.