blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2053838

EP2053838 - Administering multiple target ACD systems [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.09.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.10.2017  [2017/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aspect Software Inc.
6 Technology Park Drive
Westford, MA 01886 / US
[2009/18]
Inventor(s)01 / Koenig, Peter
4505 Saratoga Avenue
Downers Grove, MA 60515 / US
02 / Saravanan, Senthilvel
1306 Aspen Lake Court
San Jose, CA 95131 / US
03 / Mayorskiy, Vyacheslav
40 Parker Road
Chelmsford, MA 01824 / US
 [2009/18]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/36]Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Former [2009/18]Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date08167377.423.10.2008
[2009/18]
Priority number, dateUS2007097758925.10.2007         Original published format: US 977589
[2009/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2053838
Date:29.04.2009
Language:EN
[2009/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.02.2009
ClassificationIPC:H04M3/22
[2009/18]
CPC:
H04M3/2263 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/18]
TitleGerman:Verabreichung mehrerer Ziel-ACD-Systeme[2009/18]
English:Administering multiple target ACD systems[2009/18]
French:Administration de systèmes de distribution automatique d'appels à cibles multiples[2009/18]
Examination procedure09.07.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.09.2009Examination requested  [2009/43]
26.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/40]
30.05.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/40]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.10.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
28.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
27.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
27.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201609   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US6690786  (KOWAL JAMES ALLEN [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, lines 23-29 * * column 2, lines 48-57 * * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 4 * * column 6, line 34 - column 8, line 14 *;
 [A]SE519639  (TELEFONICA NACIONAL ESPANA CO [ES]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6498846  (ORUI TAKEO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6707812  (BOWMAN-AMUAH MICHEL K [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantUS6690786
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.