blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2147680

EP2147680 - Antibody against a peptide fragment (GSTSHHLVSRKSISAALEHK) of apolipoprotein B [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2010/04]Peptide-based immunization therapy for treatment of atherosclerosis and development of peptide-based assay for determination of immune responses against oxidized low density lipoprotein
[2012/28]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.04.2013
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.05.2013  [2013/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Forskarpatent i Syd AB
223 70 Lund / SE
For all designated states
Cedars-Sinai Medical Center
8701 West Third Street
Suite 290
Los Angeles, CA 90048 / US
[N/P]
Former [2010/04]For all designated states
Forskarpatent i Syd AB
223 70 Lund / SE
For all designated states
Cedars-Sinai Medical Center
8701 West Third Street, Suite 290
Los Angeles, CA 90048 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Shah, Prediman K.
111 North Layton Drive
Los Angeles, CA 90049 / US
02 / Nilsson, Jan
Toppeladugård 3
24013 Genarp / SE
 [2010/04]
Representative(s)Stenbäck, Maria Elisabeth, et al
Awapatent AB
P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
[N/P]
Former [2010/11]Stenbäck, Maria Elisabeth, et al
Awapatent AB P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
Former [2010/04]Egeröd, Lisbeth, et al
Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5
417 56 Gothenburg / SE
Application number, filing date08167532.405.04.2002
[2010/04]
Priority number, dateSE2001000123205.04.2001         Original published format: SE 0101232
[2010/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2147680
Date:27.01.2010
Language:EN
[2010/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2147680
Date:14.04.2010
[2010/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.03.2010
ClassificationIPC:A61P9/10, A61K39/00
[2012/28]
CPC:
C07K16/18 (EP); A61K38/1709 (EP); A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP); A61P9/00 (EP); A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K14/775 (EP); A61K39/00 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2010/15]C07K14/775, A61K38/17, A61K39/00
Former IPC [2010/04]A61K38/17, C07K14/775
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2010/04]
TitleGerman:Antikörper gegen ein Peptidfragment (GSTSHHLVSRKSISAALEHK) von Apoliprotein B[2012/28]
English:Antibody against a peptide fragment (GSTSHHLVSRKSISAALEHK) of apolipoprotein B[2012/28]
French:Anticorps contre un fragment peptidique (GSTSHHLVSRKSISAALEHK) d'apolipoprotéine B[2012/28]
Former [2010/04]Auf Peptiden basierte Immunisierungstherapie zur Behandlung von Atherosklerose und Entwicklung von Peptid-basierten Assays zur Bestimmung von Immunreaktionen gegen oxidiertes Lipoprotein geringer Dichte
Former [2010/04]Peptide-based immunization therapy for treatment of atherosclerosis and development of peptide-based assay for determination of immune responses against oxidized low density lipoprotein
Former [2010/04]Thérapie d'immunisation à base de peptides pour le traitement de l'athérosclérose et développement d'un dosage à base de peptides pour la détermination des réponses immunes contre une lipoprotéine oxydée à basse densité
Examination procedure03.02.2009Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1}
12.10.2010Examination requested  [2010/47]
10.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.09.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.06.2012Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.06.2012
15.06.2012Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
09.07.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.11.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/21]
04.01.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2013/21]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP02714667.9  / EP1383526
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020714667) is  27.10.2006
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
06.09.2011Request for further processing filed
06.09.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.09.2011Decision despatched
The application was refused due to failure to file the sequence listing
26.02.2009Request for further processing filed
26.02.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.03.2009Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
24.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
24.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
24.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
28.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
16.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
13.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
27.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4970144  (FAREED GEORGE [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9318067  (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9400592  (EXOCELL INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [I]WO9842751  (UNIV LEICESTER [GB], et al) [I] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5827516  (URBAN ROBERT GLEN [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5861276  (KWAK JU-WON [KR], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9908109  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [I]EP0911344  (FUJIREBIO KK [JP]) [I] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [I]WO0002920  (UNIV OTAGO [NZ], et al) [I] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [AP]WO0132070  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [AP] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [AP]WO0164008  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM BIOLOG [BE], et al) [AP] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [IP]WO0168119  (KAROLINSKA INNOVATIONS AB [SE], et al) [IP] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [AP]EP1186299  (UNIV MEDISCH CENTRUM UTRECHT [NL]) [AP] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - KNOTT T C ET AL, "RecName: Full=Apolipoprotein B-100; Short=Apo B-100; Contains: RecName: Full=Apolipoprotein B-48; Short=Apo B-48; Flags: Precursor", UNIPROT,, (20010111), XP002522464 [A] 1-9 * the whole document *
 [A]  - ZHOU XINGHUA ET AL, "LDL immunization induces T-cell-dependent antibody formation and protection against atherosclerosis", ARTERIOSCLEROSIS, THROMBOSIS, AND VASCULAR BIOLOGY, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, US, (20010101), vol. 21, no. 1, ISSN 1079-5642, pages 108 - 114, XP002522457 [A] 1-9 * the whole document *
 [A]  - GEORGE J ET AL, "HYPERIMMUNIZATION OF APO-E-DEFICIENT MICE WITH HOMOLOGOUS MALONDIALDEHYDE LOW-DENSITY LIPOPROTEIN SUPPRESSES EARLY ATHEROGENESIS", ATHEROSCLEROSIS, ELSEVIER IRELAND LTD, IE, (19980101), vol. 138, ISSN 0021-9150, pages 147 - 152, XP002941306 [A] 1-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9150(98)00015-X
 [A]  - PALINSKI W ET AL, "IMMUNOZATION OF LOW DENSITY LIPOPROTEIN (LDL) RECEPTOR-DEFICIENT RABBITS WITH HOMOLOGOUS MALONDIALDEHYDE-MODIFIED LDL REDUCES ATHEROGENESIS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19950101), vol. 92, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 821 - 825, XP002941307 [A] 1-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.92.3.821
 [A]  - PALINSKI W ET AL, "ANTISERA AND MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES SPECIFIC FOR EPITOPES GENERATED DURING OXIDATIVE MODIFICATION OF LOW DENSITY LIPOPROTEIN", ARTERIOSCLEROSIS, THE ASSOCIATION, DALLAS,TX, US, (19900101), vol. 10, ISSN 0276-5047, pages 325 - 335, XP009031016 [A] 1-9 * the whole document *
 [A]  - ROSENFELD M E ET AL, "DISTRIBUTION OF OXIDATION SPECIFIC LIPID-PROTEIN ADDUCTS AND APOLIPOPROTEIN B IN ATHEROSCLEROTIC LESIONS OF VARYING SEVERITY FROM WHHL RABBITS", ARTERIOSCLEROSIS, THE ASSOCIATION, DALLAS,TX, US, (19900501), vol. 10, no. 3, ISSN 0276-5047, pages 336 - 349, XP009031017 [A] 1-9 * the whole document *
 [A]  - LEFVERT A K, "Heterogeneity of autoantibodies against cardiolipin and oxidatively modified LDLs revealed by human monoclonal antibodies", JOURNAL OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, OXFORD, GB, (20000301), vol. 247, no. 3, ISSN 0954-6820, pages 385 - 390, XP002522458 [A] 1-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2796.2000.00658.x
 [A]  - DUNNING A M ET AL, "ASSOCIATION BETWEEN EPITOPES DETECTED BY MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY BIP-45 AND THE XBAL POLYMORPHISM OF APOLIPOPROTEIN B", CLINICAL GENETICS, WILEY-BLACKWELL MUNKSGAARD, DK, (19880101), vol. 33, no. 3, ISSN 0009-9163, pages 181 - 188, XP002522459 [A] 1-9 * the whole document *
 [A]  - YOUNG STEPHEN G ET AL, "Definition of a nonlinear conformational epitope for the apolipoprotein B-100-specific monoclonal antibody, MB47", JOURNAL OF LIPID RESEARCH, BETHESDA, MD, US, (19940101), vol. 35, no. 3, ISSN 0022-2275, pages 399 - 407, XP002522462 [A] 1-9 * the whole document *
 [T]  - FREDRIKSON GUNILLA NORDIN ET AL, "Inhibition of atherosclerosis in apo E null mice by immunization with native and MDA-modified apo B peptide sequences", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN COLLEGE OF CARDIOLOGY, ELSEVIER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20020306), vol. 39, no. 5 Supplement A, ISSN 0735-1097, page 240A, XP002522463 [T] 1-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0735-1097(02)81074-9
 [T]  - FREDRIKSON GUNILLA NORDIN ET AL, "Atheroprotective immunization with MDA-modified apo B-100 peptide sequences is associated with activation of Th2 specific antibody expression", AUTOIMMUNITY, HARWOOD, CHUR, CH, (20050301), vol. 38, no. 2, ISSN 0891-6934, pages 171 - 179, XP002473012 [T] 1-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/08916930500050525
by applicantUS4970144
 WO9842751
 US5861276
 WO9908109
 EP0911344
 US5972890
    - AMELI S ET AL., "Effect of immunization with homologous LDL and oxidized LDL on early atherosclerosis in hypercholesterolemic rabbits", ARTERIOSCLER THROMB VASC BIOL., (1996), vol. 16, pages 1074 - 1079
    - FREIGANG S; HÖRKKÖ S; MILLER E; WITZTUM J.L.; PALINSKI W., "Immunization of LDL receptor-deficient mice with homologous malondialdehyde-modified and native LDL reduces progression of atherosclerosis by mechanisms other than induction of high titiers of antibodies to oxidative neoepitopes", ARTERIOSCLER THROMB VASC BIOL., (1998), vol. 18, pages 1972 - 1982
    - GEORGE J ET AL., "Hyperimmunization of apo-E-deficient mice with homologous malondialdehyde low-density lipoprotein suppresses early atherogenesis", ATHEROSCLEROSIS, (1998), vol. 138, doi:doi:10.1016/S0021-9150(98)00015-X, pages 147 - 152, XP002941306

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9150(98)00015-X
    - ALVING C.R. ET AL., "Immunization with cholesterol-rich liposomes induces anticholesterol antibodies and reduces diet-induced hypercholestgerolemia and plaque formation", J. LAB. CLIN. MED., (1996), vol. 127, pages 40 - 49
    - ZHOU X; CALIGIURI G; HAMSTEN A; LEFVERT A.K.; HANSSON G.K., "LDL immunization induces T-cell-dependent antibody formation and protection against atherosclerosis", ARTERIOSCLER THROMB VASC BIOL., (2001), vol. 21, pages 108 - 114
    - NAKASHIMA Y; PLUMP A.S.; RAINES E.W.; BRESLOW J.L.; ROSS R., "Apo-E-deficient mice develop lesions of all phases of atherosclerosis throughout the arterial tree", ARTERIOSCLER THROMB, (1994), vol. 14, pages 133 - 140
    - REDDICK R.L.; ZHANG S.H.; MAEDA N., "Atherosclerosis in mice lacking apo E. Evaluation of lesional development and progression", ARTERIOSCLER THROMB, (1994), vol. 14, pages 141 - 147
    - SHAH P,K. ET AL., "Effects of recombinant apolipoprotein A-I(Milano) on aortic atherosclerosis in apolipoprotein E-deficient mice", CIRCULATION, (1998), vol. 97, pages 780 - 785
    - GLASS, C.K.; WITZTUM, J,L, "Atherosclerosis. The road ahead", CELL, (2001), vol. 104, pages 503 - 16
    - HOLVOET, P.; VANHAECKE, J.; JANSSENS, S.; VAN DE WERF, F.; COLLEN, D., "Oxidized LDL and malondialdehyde-modified LDL in patients with acute coronary syndromes and stable coronary artery disease", CIRCULATION, (1998), vol. 98, pages 1487 - 94, XP000870493
    - EHARA, S. ET AL., "Elevated levels of oxidized low density lipoprotein show a positive relationship with the severity of acute coronary syndromes", CIRCULATION, (2001), vol. 103, pages 1955 - 60
    - KRYCH-GOLDBERG, M.; ATKINSON, J.P., "Structure-function relationships of complement receptor type 1", IMMUNOL REV, (2001), vol. 180, pages 112 - 22
    - NICOLETTI, A.; CALIGIURI, G.; PAULSSON, G.; HANSSON, G,K., "Functionality of specific immunity in atherosclerosis", AM HEART J, (1999), vol. 138, pages 5438 - 43
    - CHOBANIAN, A.V.; HAUDENSCHILD, C.C.; NICKERSON, C.; DRAGO, R., "Antiatherogenic effect of captopril in the Watanabe heritable hyperlipidemic rabbit", HYPERTENSION, (1990), vol. 15, pages 327 - 31
    - INOUE, I. ET AL., "Macrophage colony stimulating factor prevents the progression of atherosclerosis in Watanabe heritable hyperlipidemic rabbits", ATHEROSCLEROSIS, (1992), vol. 93, pages 245 - 54
    - BOURASSA, P.A.; MILOS, P.M.; GAYNOR, B.J.; BRESLOW, J.L.; AIELLO, R.J., "Estrogen reduces atherosclerotic lesion development in apolipoprotein E- deficient mice", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (1996), vol. 93, pages 10022 - 7
    - SPARROW, C.P. ET AL., "Simvastatin has anti-inflammatory and antiatherosclerotic activities independent of plasma cholesterol lowering", ARTCRIOSCLER THROMB VASC BIOL, (2001), vol. 21, pages 115 - 21
    - NAKASHIMA, Y.; PLUMP, A.S.; RAINES, E.W.; BRESLOW, J.L.; ROSS, R., "ApoE-deficient mice develop lesions of all phases of atherosclerosis throughout the arterial tree", ARTERIOSCLER THROMB, (1994), vol. 14, pages 133 - 40
    - PALINSKI, W ET AL., "ApoE-deficient mice are a model of lipoprotein oxidation in atherogenesis, Demonstration of oxidation-specific epitopes in lesions and high titers of autoantibodies to malondialdehyde-lysine in serum", ARTERIOSCLER THROMB, (1994), vol. 14, pages 605 - 16, XP000603632
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.