Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2017845

EP2017845 - Method for calculating the addresses in the navigation pack of a VOBU unit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.11.2013
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2013No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.12.2013  [2013/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JVC KENWOOD Corporation
12, Moriya-cho 3-chome
Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi
Kanagawa 221-0022 / JP
[2012/16]
Former [2009/04]For all designated states
VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, LIMITED
12, 3-chome, Moriya-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi
Kanagawa-ken, 221-8528 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sugahara, Takayuki
VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, LIMITED
c/o Legal & I.P.D.
12, 3-chome Moriya-cho
Kanagawa-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken 221-8528 / JP
02 / Suzuki, Junzo
VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, LIMITED
c/o Legal & I.P.D.
12, 3-chome Moriya-cho
Kanagawa-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken 221-8528 / JP
 [2013/03]
Former [2009/04]01 / Sugahara, Takayuki
VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, LIMITED c/o Legal & I.P.D. 12, 3-chome Moriya-cho
Kanagawa-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken 221-8528 / JP
02 / Suzuki, Junzo
VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, LIMITED c/o Legal & I.P.D. 12, 3-chome Moriya-cho
Kanagawa-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken 221-8528 / JP
Representative(s)Wagner & Geyer
Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[2013/03]
Former [2011/20]Wagner & Geyer
Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2009/35]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2009/04]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date08167712.201.07.1999
[2009/04]
Priority number, dateJP1998018638501.07.1998         Original published format: JP 18638598
[2009/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2017845
Date:21.01.2009
Language:EN
[2009/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2017845
Date:18.02.2009
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2017845
Date:16.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/50
[2009/08]
Former International [2009/04]G11B27/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/04]
TitleGerman:Verfahren für das Berechnen der Adressen in einem Navigationspaket eines VOBUs[2009/04]
English:Method for calculating the addresses in the navigation pack of a VOBU unit[2009/04]
French:Méthode pour le calcul des adresses contenues dans un paquet de navigation d'un VOBU[2009/04]
Examination procedure28.10.2008Examination requested  [2009/04]
05.03.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.07.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.12.2012Fee for grant paid
05.12.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP99112769.7  / EP0969671
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990112769) is  13.10.2006
Opposition(s)17.10.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
28.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
28.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
28.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
28.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
28.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
28.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
28.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
16.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
14.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
12.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
13.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0847198  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 18, line 15 - page 19, line 50; figure 25 *;
 [A]EP0797199  (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * page 12, line 10 - page 14, line 19 *;
 [A]EP0724264  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantJPH08273304
 JPH0827330