Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2025591

EP2025591 - Weathervaning LNG offloading system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.11.2015
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.11.2015No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.12.2015  [2015/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Single Buoy Moorings Inc.
P.O. Box 152
1723 Marly / CH
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Wille, Hein
9 Rue Monté St. Michel
F-06360, Eze / FR
02 / Queau, Jean-Pierre
15 rue Deloy
FR-06000, Nice / FR
03 / Poldervaart, Leendert
2 Impasse du Castelleretto
MC-98000, Monaco / MC
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
[2013/28]
Former [2009/08]van Westenbrugge, Andries , et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date08168142.112.12.2002
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateEP2001020486512.12.2001         Original published format: EP 01204865
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2025591
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2025591
Date:13.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2025591
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:B63B27/24, E02B3/20, F17C9/02, B63B22/02, B63B27/34
[2014/34]
Former International [2009/08]B63B22/02, B63B27/24, E02B3/20, F17C9/02
Designated contracting statesES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2009/08]
TitleGerman:Flüssigerdgas-Entladesystem bei Seitenwind[2009/08]
English:Weathervaning LNG offloading system[2009/08]
French:Système de déchargement de GNL au mouillage[2009/08]
Examination procedure03.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
24.07.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.11.2014Fee for grant paid
10.11.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.11.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP02795194.6  / EP1453723
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020795194) is  06.06.2007
Opposition(s)01.10.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
03.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
03.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
03.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
03.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
30.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
22.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
31.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
23.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
10.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
20.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 13
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES31.12.2014
[2015/33]
Documents cited:Search[A]US3354479  (PIETER KOPPENOL, et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPS58202183  ;
 [A]GB1097258  (SHELL INT RESEARCH) [A] 6-19 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3245438  (MCCAMMON GEORGE A) [A] 6-19 * the whole document *
 [A]  - ZUBIATE R ET AL, "SINGLE POINT MOORING SYSTEM FOR FLOATING LNG PLANT", OCEAN INDUSTRY, GULF PUBLISHING, HOUSTON, TX, US, (19781101), vol. 11, no. 13, ISSN 0029-8026, page 75,77/78, XP008003458 [A] 1-19 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840302), vol. 008, no. 47, Database accession no. (M - 280), [A] 1-5 * abstract *
by applicantEP1202973
 US4876978
 EP19980201805
 EP19980202824