Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2058155

EP2058155 - Suspension device and method during spring action and/or damping action for a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.03.2018
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.07.2019New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAE Systems Hägglunds Aktiebolag
891 82 Örnsköldsvik / SE
[2009/20]
Inventor(s)01 / Hägglund, Henrik
Granvägen 9
890 50 Björna / SE
02 / Christensen, Assar
Hantverkaregatan 31
891 34 Örnsköldsvik / SE
 [2016/08]
Former [2009/20]01 / Hägglund, Henrik
Granvägen 9
890 50 Björna / SE
02 / Christensen, Assar
Solgårdsgatan 18B
891 34 Örnsköldsvik / SE
Representative(s)Zacco Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
[2016/08]
Former [2014/45]Zacco Sweden AB
Valhallavägen 117
P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Former [2009/41]Börlin, Maria , et al
Albihns AB P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Former [2009/20]Winblad, Hans Peter
Albihns AB P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date08168261.904.11.2008
[2009/20]
Priority number, dateSE2007000248109.11.2007         Original published format: SE 0702481
[2009/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2058155
Date:13.05.2009
Language:EN
[2009/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2058155
Date:24.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.03.2009
ClassificationInternational:B60G17/016, B60G17/08, F16F9/06, B60G17/005, B60G17/015
[2009/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/08]
Former [2009/20]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Aufhängungsvorrichtung und Verfahren während der Federaktion und / oder Dämpfungsaktion für ein Fahrzeug[2009/20]
English:Suspension device and method during spring action and/or damping action for a vehicle[2009/20]
French:Dispositif de suspension et procédé pendant l'action de ressort et/ou l'action d'amortissement d'un véhicule[2009/20]
Examination procedure16.09.2009Examination requested  [2009/44]
12.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.08.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.02.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.08.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.12.2015Fee for grant paid
18.12.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.12.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.10.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.11.2016  01.12.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Krauss-Maffei Wegmann GmbH & Co. KG
Krauss-Maffei-Strasse 11
80997 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Feder Walter Ebert
Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten mbB
Achenbachstrasse 59
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2017/01]
Opponent(s)01  24.11.2016  01.12.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Krauss-Maffei Wegmann GmbH & Co. KG
Krauss-Maffei-Strasse 11
80997 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Feder Walter Ebert
Patentanwälte Achenbachstrasse 59
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
11.01.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.04.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
01.03.2018Date of oral proceedings
29.03.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
29.03.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition28.05.2018Appeal received No.  T1362/18
31.07.2018Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
28.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
24.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.11.2008
AT24.02.2016
BE24.02.2016
CY24.02.2016
CZ24.02.2016
DK24.02.2016
EE24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
IS24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
LV24.02.2016
MC24.02.2016
NL24.02.2016
RO24.02.2016
SE24.02.2016
SI24.02.2016
SK24.02.2016
BG24.05.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
IE04.11.2016
MT04.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
[2018/43]
Former [2018/32]HU04.11.2008
AT24.02.2016
BE24.02.2016
CY24.02.2016
CZ24.02.2016
DK24.02.2016
EE24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
IS24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
LV24.02.2016
MC24.02.2016
NL24.02.2016
RO24.02.2016
SE24.02.2016
SI24.02.2016
SK24.02.2016
BG24.05.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
IE04.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2018/28]HU04.11.2008
AT24.02.2016
BE24.02.2016
CY24.02.2016
CZ24.02.2016
DK24.02.2016
EE24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
LV24.02.2016
MC24.02.2016
NL24.02.2016
RO24.02.2016
SE24.02.2016
SI24.02.2016
SK24.02.2016
BG24.05.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
IE04.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/51]AT24.02.2016
BE24.02.2016
CZ24.02.2016
DK24.02.2016
EE24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
LV24.02.2016
NL24.02.2016
RO24.02.2016
SE24.02.2016
SI24.02.2016
SK24.02.2016
BG24.05.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
IE04.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/48]AT24.02.2016
BE24.02.2016
CZ24.02.2016
DK24.02.2016
EE24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
LV24.02.2016
NL24.02.2016
RO24.02.2016
SE24.02.2016
SI24.02.2016
SK24.02.2016
BG24.05.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/13]AT24.02.2016
BE24.02.2016
CZ24.02.2016
DK24.02.2016
EE24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
LV24.02.2016
NL24.02.2016
RO24.02.2016
SE24.02.2016
SI24.02.2016
SK24.02.2016
BG24.05.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
Former [2017/03]AT24.02.2016
BE24.02.2016
CZ24.02.2016
DK24.02.2016
EE24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
LV24.02.2016
NL24.02.2016
RO24.02.2016
SE24.02.2016
SK24.02.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
Former [2016/50]AT24.02.2016
CZ24.02.2016
DK24.02.2016
EE24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
LV24.02.2016
NL24.02.2016
RO24.02.2016
SE24.02.2016
SK24.02.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
Former [2016/49]AT24.02.2016
DK24.02.2016
EE24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
LV24.02.2016
NL24.02.2016
SE24.02.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
Former [2016/46]AT24.02.2016
DK24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
LV24.02.2016
NL24.02.2016
SE24.02.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
Former [2016/39]AT24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
LV24.02.2016
NL24.02.2016
SE24.02.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
Former [2016/38]AT24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
NL24.02.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
Former [2016/36]AT24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
NL24.02.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
Former [2016/35]HR24.02.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0607516  (CADILLAC GAGE TEXTRON [US]) [X] 1-8,10-12,14-17 * column 5, line 31 - column 9, line 1; figure 6a *;
 [XY]DE19748243  (INGELHEIM PETER GRAF VON [DE]) [X] 1-4,10,11,14 * the whole document * [Y] 5,7-9,11-13,15-17;
 [YA]EP1757473  (TECHNOLOGY INVESTMENTS LTD [IE]) [Y] 5,7-9,11-13,15-17 * the whole document * [A] 1-4,6,10,14;
 [X]US2005184475  (HAMM ALTON B [US]) [X] 1,2,7-17 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0425885  (HEMSCHEIDT MASCHF HERMANN [DE]) [X] 1,3-6,10,14 * column 19, line 16 - column 26, line 32; figure 6 *;
 [XA]EP1759894  (CNH ITALIA SPA [IT]) [X] 1-4,10,14 * the whole document * [A] 7,11;
 [X]US2003085042  (ROGALA JEFFREY A [US]) [X] 1,3-5,10,14 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE102005040911  (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19833854  (MANNESMANN SACHS AG [DE]) [A] 1,3-5,10 * the whole document *;
 [DA]US4159106  (NYMAN BENGT E [US]) [DA] 1,3,10 * the whole document *
ExaminationUS5682968
by applicantUS4153237
 US4720085
 US4159106
OppositionEP0607516
 DE19748243
 US2005184475
 EP0425885
 EP1759894
 US2003085042
 US4159106
 DE102005040911
 US5682968
 EP1757473
 DE19833854
 US4153237
 US4720085
 US2006151964
 JPS6349512
 US2006060438
 US5080392
 DE3414257
 DE3823043
 US4212484
 DE10250448
 US3689103
 US5290048
 DE10345956
 DE10305790
 US4589678
 DE3844803
 US2008269987
 DE3616541