Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2028862

EP2028862 - MPEG table structure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, LU, TR
published on 15.08.2018  [2018/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[2016/04]
Former [2010/07]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
THOMSON Licensing
46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Lepine, Thierry
4 square Salvador Allende
94600 Choisy le Roi / FR
02 / Chouteau, Philippe
51 avenue du General Leclerc
78220 Viroflay / FR
03 / Burckard, Antoine
18 rue Louis Antoine Bougainville
78180 Montigny le Bretonneux / FR
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Huchet, Anne , et al
TECHNICOLOR
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/04]Huchet, Anne , et al
Technicolor
1, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
Former [2014/11]Huchet, Anne , et al
TECHNICOLOR European Patent Operations 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
Former [2011/31]Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte , et al
Technicolor European Patent Operations 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
Former [2009/09]Berthier, Karine
THOMSON, European Patent Operations, 46 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo
92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date08168338.511.06.2002
[2009/09]
Priority number, dateEP2001040151211.06.2001         Original published format: EP 01401512
EP2001030631523.07.2001         Original published format: EP 01306315
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2028862
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2028862
Date:10.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2028862
Date:27.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.09.2012
ClassificationInternational:H04N21/434, H04N21/2362, H04N21/81, H04N5/44, H04N5/445
[2015/14]
Former International [2012/41]H04N21/434, H04N21/2362, H04N21/81
Former International [2009/09]H04N7/24, H04N7/26, H04N7/52, H04N5/00, H04L29/06, H04N7/16
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2016/04]
Former [2009/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:MPEG-Tabellenstruktur[2009/09]
English:MPEG table structure[2009/09]
French:Structure de table MPEG[2009/09]
Examination procedure02.04.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.04.2013Examination requested  [2013/20]
06.05.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.03.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.07.2015Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
29.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.11.2015Fee for grant paid
24.11.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.11.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP02762627.4  / EP1400125
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020762627) is  14.11.2005
Opposition(s)28.10.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
05.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
05.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
05.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
05.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
25.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
23.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
24.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
26.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
25.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
27.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 13
25.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 14
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.01.2016
BE27.01.2016
CY27.01.2016
DK27.01.2016
ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
IT27.01.2016
MC27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
SE27.01.2016
TR27.01.2016
GR28.04.2016
PT27.05.2016
IE11.06.2016
LU11.06.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
[2018/29]
Former [2017/24]AT27.01.2016
BE27.01.2016
DK27.01.2016
ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
IT27.01.2016
MC27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
SE27.01.2016
GR28.04.2016
PT27.05.2016
IE11.06.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
Former [2017/07]AT27.01.2016
BE27.01.2016
DK27.01.2016
ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
IT27.01.2016
MC27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
SE27.01.2016
GR28.04.2016
PT27.05.2016
Former [2017/03]AT27.01.2016
BE27.01.2016
DK27.01.2016
ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
IT27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
SE27.01.2016
GR28.04.2016
PT27.05.2016
Former [2016/46]AT27.01.2016
DK27.01.2016
ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
IT27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
SE27.01.2016
GR28.04.2016
PT27.05.2016
Former [2016/39]AT27.01.2016
ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
IT27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
SE27.01.2016
GR28.04.2016
PT27.05.2016
Former [2016/38]AT27.01.2016
ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
IT27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
GR28.04.2016
PT27.05.2016
Former [2016/36]AT27.01.2016
ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
IT27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
GR28.04.2016
Former [2016/35]ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
GR28.04.2016
Former [2016/30]NL27.01.2016
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9965230  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 6 * page 5, line 18 - page 7, line 12 *;
 [A]EP0964572  (CANAL PLUS SA [FR]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0030] - [0105] *;
 [IY]  "INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY - GENERIC CODING OF MOVING PICTURES AND ASSOCIATED AUDIO INFORMATION: SYSTEMS. TECHNOLOGIES DE L'INFORMATION - CODAGE DES IMAGES ANIMEES ET DU SON ASSOCIE: SYSTEMES", INTERNATIONAL STANDARD ISO/IEC, XX, XX, (19960415), vol. 13818-1, pages I - XY,01, XP000667435 [I] 1-5,7-11 * page 39 - page 47, paragraph 2.4.4 * * page 85 - page 92, paragraph Annex C * * page 111, paragraph Annex H * [Y] 6
 [IY]  "Digital Video Broadcasting (DVB); Specification for Service Information (SI) in DVB systems; ETSI EN 300 468", IEEE, LIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, (20001101), vol. BC, no. V1.4.1, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014001577 [I] 1-5,7-11 * page 16 - page 22 * * page 25, paragraph 6.1 - page 27, paragraph 6.2 * [Y] 6
 [A]  DUTTA S ET AL, "Smart video streams: 101 uses of the user data field in MPEG", CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON SIGNALS, SYSTEMSAND COMPUTERS, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY PRESS, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, (19951030), vol. 2, pages 1462 - 1466, XP002123091 [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
by applicantWO9843431
 WO9843415