Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2028193

EP2028193 - Synthetic immunoglobulin domains with binding properties engineered in regions of the molecule different from the complementarity determining regions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.01.2013
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
f-star Biotechnologische Forschungs- und Entwicklungsges.m.b.H.
Gastgebgasse 5-13
1230 Wien / AT
[2009/09]
Inventor(s)01 / Rüker, Florian
Montigasse 6
1170 Vienna / AT
02 / Himmler, Gottfried
Donau-Oder-Kanal IV SW80
2301 Groß-Enzersdorf / AT
03 / Wozniak-Knopp, Gordana
Peter-Jordan-Straße 163/2/1
1180 Vienna / AT
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Redl, Gerda
REDL Life Science Patent Attorneys
Donau-City-Straße 11
1220 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [2012/10]Redl, Gerda
Tech Gate Vienna Donau-City-Straße 1
1220 Wien / AT
Former [2009/09]Redl, Gerda
Tech Gate Vienna Donau-City-Straße 1
A-1220 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date08168439.105.01.2006
[2009/09]
Priority number, dateUS20050641144P05.01.2005         Original published format: US 641144 P
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2028193
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2028193
Date:07.03.2012
Language:EN
[2012/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:C07K16/00, C12N15/62, C07K19/00
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
Extension statesAL03.03.2009
BA03.03.2009
HR03.03.2009
MK03.03.2009
YU03.03.2009
TitleGerman:Synthetische Immunglobulindomänen mit in Regionen des Moleküls, die sich von den die Komplementarität bestimmenden Bereichen unterscheiden, modifizierten Bindeeigenschaften[2009/09]
English:Synthetic immunoglobulin domains with binding properties engineered in regions of the molecule different from the complementarity determining regions[2009/09]
French:Domaines d'immunoglobulines synthétiques avec des propriétés de liaison modifiées dans des régions de la molécule, différentes des régions déterminant la complémentarité[2009/09]
Examination procedure06.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
14.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.01.2012Fee for grant paid
05.01.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06703578.2  / EP1699826
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060703578) is  22.03.2007
Opposition(s)10.12.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2013/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
26.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
22.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
24.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
25.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.01.2006
CY07.03.2012
CZ07.03.2012
EE07.03.2012
LT07.03.2012
LV07.03.2012
PL07.03.2012
RO07.03.2012
SI07.03.2012
SK07.03.2012
BG07.06.2012
IS07.07.2012
[2015/34]
Former [2013/33]CY07.03.2012
CZ07.03.2012
EE07.03.2012
LT07.03.2012
LV07.03.2012
PL07.03.2012
RO07.03.2012
SI07.03.2012
SK07.03.2012
BG07.06.2012
IS07.07.2012
Former [2012/50]CY07.03.2012
CZ07.03.2012
EE07.03.2012
LT07.03.2012
LV07.03.2012
PL07.03.2012
RO07.03.2012
SI07.03.2012
SK07.03.2012
IS07.07.2012
Former [2012/49]CY07.03.2012
CZ07.03.2012
EE07.03.2012
LT07.03.2012
LV07.03.2012
PL07.03.2012
RO07.03.2012
SI07.03.2012
IS07.07.2012
Former [2012/48]CY07.03.2012
EE07.03.2012
LT07.03.2012
LV07.03.2012
Former [2012/41]CY07.03.2012
LT07.03.2012
LV07.03.2012
Former [2012/39]LT07.03.2012
LV07.03.2012
Former [2012/34]LT07.03.2012
Documents cited:Search[A]WO0183525  (AMGEN INC [US]) [A] 1-17 * claims 26-40,57-60 *;
 [DA]US6294654  (BOGEN BJARNE [NO], et al) [DA] 1-17 * figures 1,4,5; claims 1-8 *;
 [A]US2002106370  (CARDY DONALD LEONARD NICHOLAS [GB], et al) [A] 1-17 * figures 1-3,5,6; examples 1-9; claims 1-23 *;
 [A]WO0232925  (PHYLOS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * page 1 - page 5, line 23 *;
 [E]WO2006036834  (AMGEN INC [US]) [E] 1-17 * paragraphs [0150] , [0174]; claim 52; table 12 * * page 60, lines 7-18 *
Examination   - "Chapter 3-5, fig. 3.5", Janeway et al, Immunobiology, 6th Edition, Garland Science Publishing, (2005), page 109, ISBN 0815341016
    - LEFRANC MARIE-PAULE ET AL, "IMGT unique numbering for immunoglobulin and T cell receptor variable domains and Ig superfamily V-like domains.", DEVELOPMENTAL AND COMPARATIVE IMMUNOLOGY JAN 2003 LNKD- PUBMED:12477501, (200301), vol. 27, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/S0145-305X(02)00039-3, ISSN 0145-305X, pages 55 - 77, XP055144492

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0145-305X(02)00039-3
by applicantUS6602684
 US2005054832