Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2065811

EP2065811 - Compressed data storage to provide recent and summary data [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.10.2015
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.10.2019Deletion: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure 
02.10.2019Change: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
General Electric Company
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[2009/23]
Inventor(s)01 / Harshfield, James Daniel
2612 Robin Hood Road, SE
Roanoke, VA 24014-3422 / US
 [2009/23]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[N/P]
Former [2009/23]Bedford, Grant Richard
London Patent Operation GE International Inc 15 John Adam Street
London WC2N 6LU / GB
Application number, filing date08168470.606.11.2008
[2009/23]
Priority number, dateUS2007094286320.11.2007         Original published format: US 942863
[2009/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2065811
Date:03.06.2009
Language:EN
[2009/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.02.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2009/23]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   ES [2010/06]
Former [2009/23]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Komprimierte Datenspeicherung zur Bereitstellung von kürzlichen und zusammenfassenden Daten[2009/23]
English:Compressed data storage to provide recent and summary data[2009/23]
French:Stockage de données compressées pour fournir des données récentes et de résumé[2009/23]
Examination procedure03.12.2009Examination requested  [2010/02]
04.12.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
04.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.01.2010Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, EE, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
14.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2016Date of oral proceedings
10.11.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
10.11.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination20.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0909/17
20.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.01.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
02.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
01.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
30.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201811   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0239310  (WISENGINE INC [KR]; PARK CHONG MOK [KR]; LEE KOOK HEE [KR]) [X] 1-10 * page 1 - page 39 *;
 [X]US2002007359  (NGUYEN LYNH [US]) [X] 1-10 * column 1 - column 16 *