Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2065811 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2065811



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 324
07.01.2020 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
18.10.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
14.06.2019 Invitation to give notice of appointment of a professional representative and to file an authorisation Appeal 4
16.05.2019 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 3
04.01.2019 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
04.07.2018 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
09.11.2017 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
18.04.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
31.03.2017 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
20.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
20.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
20.03.2017 Claims Appeal 2
20.03.2017 Claims Appeal 2
20.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.03.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 3
08.02.2017 Refund of fees Appeal 1
20.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
20.01.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
21.11.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
10.11.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
10.11.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
10.11.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
10.11.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
10.11.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
10.11.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
10.11.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
10.11.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
10.11.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
10.11.2016 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
10.11.2016 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
10.11.2016 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 9
10.11.2016 Means of redress Search / examination 2
10.11.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
10.11.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
10.11.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
29.06.2016 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
22.06.2016 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 3
21.06.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 53
21.06.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
21.06.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 9
21.06.2016 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
21.06.2016 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
21.06.2016 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
23.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
23.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
23.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
23.05.2016 Claims Search / examination 2
23.05.2016 Claims Search / examination 2
23.05.2016 Claims Search / examination 2
23.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.05.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 4
08.02.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
08.02.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
26.01.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
26.01.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
26.01.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
07.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
07.10.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
07.10.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
07.10.2015 Description Search / examination 2
07.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.10.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
29.05.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
29.05.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.05.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
03.07.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
01.07.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
14.07.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.07.2010 Claims Search / examination 1
14.07.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.07.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.05.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
18.05.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
11.05.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.05.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.05.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.04.2010 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 1
11.01.2010 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 2
04.01.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.07.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 34
05.06.2009 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
07.05.2009 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
20.03.2009 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
05.03.2009 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
05.03.2009 Priority document Search / examination 33
12.02.2009 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
12.02.2009 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
12.02.2009 European search opinion Search / examination 2
12.02.2009 European search report Search / examination 1
06.11.2008 Abstract Search / examination 1
06.11.2008 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
06.11.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
06.11.2008 Description Search / examination 21
06.11.2008 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.11.2008 Drawings Search / examination 1
06.11.2008 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4