Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2186613

EP2186613 - High-efficiency system for dehumidifying and/or drying plastic materials [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.04.2013
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.05.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
29.05.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Piovan S.P.A.
Via delle Industrie, 16
30036 Santa Maria Di Sala / IT
[2010/20]
Inventor(s)01 / Bellio, Enrico
PIOVAN Spa
Via delle Industrie, 16
30036, S.MARIA DI SALA (VE) / IT
 [2013/22]
Former [2010/20]01 / Bellio, Enrico
PIOVAN Spa Via delle Industrie, 16
30036, S.MARIA DI SALA (VE) / IT
Representative(s)Crugnola, Pietro
Luppi Intellectual Property Srl
Viale Corassori, 54
41124 Modena / IT
[N/P]
Former [2013/22]Crugnola, Pietro
Luppi Crugnola & Partners S.r.l. Viale Corassori 54
41100 Modena / IT
Former [2010/20]Crugnola, Pietro
Luppi Crugnola & Partners S.r.l. Viale Corassori 54
41100 Modena / IT
Application number, filing date08169234.517.11.2008
[2010/20]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2186613
Date:19.05.2010
Language:EN
[2010/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2186613
Date:29.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.07.2009
ClassificationInternational:B29B13/06, F26B21/12, F26B17/12, F26B9/06
[2012/52]
Former International [2010/20]B29B13/06, F26B21/12, F26B17/14
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/20]
TitleGerman:Hocheffiziente Anlage zum Entfeuchten und/oder Trocknen von Kunststoffmaterialien[2010/20]
English:High-efficiency system for dehumidifying and/or drying plastic materials[2010/20]
French:Système à haut rendement pour déshumidifier et/ou sécher des matières plastiques[2013/02]
Former [2010/20]Système à haut rendement pour déshumidifier et/ou sécher de matières plastiques
Examination procedure17.11.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.11.2010Examination requested  [2010/52]
18.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.10.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.04.2013Fee for grant paid
16.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.04.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.02.2014   
Moretto S.P.A.
Via dell'Artigianato, 3
35010 Massanzago (Padova) / IT
Opponent's representative
Zanettin, Gianluigi, et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A.
Piazza Mario Saggin, 2
35131 Padova / IT
 02  28.02.2014   
Plastic Systems S.p.A.
Via G. Marconi, 6
35010 Borgoricco (PD) / IT
Opponent's representative
Susanetto, Carlo, et al
Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l.
Piazzetta Cappellato Pedrocchi, 18
35122 Padova / IT
 [N/P]
Former [2014/16]
Opponent(s)01  27.02.2014   
Moretto S.P.A.
Via dell'Artigianato, 3
35010 Massanzago (Padova) / IT
Opponent's representative
Zanettin, Gianluigi, et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A.
Via Berchet, 9
35131 Padova / IT
 02  28.02.2014   
Plastic Systems S.p.A.
Via G. Marconi, 6
35010 Borgoricco (PD) / IT
Opponent's representative
Susanetto, Carlo, et al
Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l. Piazzetta Cappellato Pedrocchi, 18
35122 Padova / IT
04.04.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.10.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.06.2016Date of oral proceedings
06.07.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
06.07.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition06.09.2016Appeal received No.  T2045/16
16.11.2016Statement of grounds filed
05.09.2016Appeal received No.  T2045/16
16.11.2016Statement of grounds filed
27.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
22.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.11.2008
AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CY29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
IT29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
MT29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
TR29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
GB17.11.2013
IE17.11.2013
LU17.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
FR02.12.2013
[2015/41]
Former [2015/34]HU17.11.2008
AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CY29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
IT29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
TR29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
GB17.11.2013
IE17.11.2013
LU17.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
FR02.12.2013
Former [2015/32]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CY29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
IT29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
TR29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
GB17.11.2013
IE17.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
FR02.12.2013
Former [2015/30]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CY29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
IT29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
GB17.11.2013
IE17.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
FR02.12.2013
Former [2014/51]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
IT29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
GB17.11.2013
IE17.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
FR02.12.2013
Former [2014/48]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
IT29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
IE17.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2014/34]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
IT29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2014/33]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
IT29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/14]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
IT29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/11]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
IT29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/10]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/09]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/06]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/02]AT29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/51]AT29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/50]AT29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/49]AT29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/48]AT29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
NO29.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT29.05.2013
NO29.08.2013
PT30.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2006168843  (ZLOTOS MICHAEL [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-10,13-15 * page 1, line 3 - line 6 * * page 1, line 29 - line 33 * * page 3, line 25 - line 29 * * page 5, line 25 - line 36 * * page 6, line 36 - page 10, line 37 * * figure 1 * [Y] 11,12;
 [X]DE29621313U  (DIGICOLOR GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6,8,13,15 * paragraphs [0033] - [0039] - [0107] - [0113] * * figures 1,4 *;
 [Y]EP1650517  (MORETTO S P A [IT]) [Y] 11 * paragraphs [0033] , [0036] * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]DE19719483  (MOTAN HOLDING GMBH [DE]) [Y] 12 * column 5, line 11 - line 14 * * figure 1 *
ExaminationUS2005091872