Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2075002

EP2075002 - Use of myoblasts in the manufacture of a medicament for treating stress urinary incontinence [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/27]Use of myoblasts in the manufacture of a medicament for treating stress urinary incontinence
[2012/07]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.01.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 20.11.2019  [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
University of Pittsburgh - Of the Commonwealth System of Higher Education
200 Gardner Steel Conference Center
Thackeray & O'Hara Streets
Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US
[N/P]
Former [2013/40]For all designated states
University of Pittsburgh - Of The Commonwealth System of Higher Education
200 Gardner Steel Conference Center
Thackeray & O'Hara Streets
Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US
Former [2009/27]For all designated states
University of Pittsburgh
200 Gardner Steel Conference Center Thackeray & O'Hara Streets
Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Chancellor, Michael B.
5836 Ferree Street
Pittsburgh, PA 15217 / US
02 / Huard, Johnny
210 Pine Cone Court
Waxford, PA 15090 / US
 [2009/27]
Representative(s)Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/30]Cowley, Catherine Mary , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
Former [2013/07]Killin, Stephen James , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
Former [2009/27]Killin, Stephen James , et al
Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date08169379.830.04.1999
[2009/27]
Priority number, dateUS19980083917P01.05.1998         Original published format: US 83917 P
[2009/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2075002
Date:01.07.2009
Language:EN
[2009/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2075002
Date:08.07.2009
[2009/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2075002
Date:13.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.06.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61K35/34, C12N5/0775, A61P13/02
[2012/07]
Former International [2009/27]A61K35/34, C12N5/08, A61P13/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2012/37]
Former [2009/27]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verwendung von Myoblasten bei der Herstellung eines Arzneimittels zur Behandlung von stressbedingter Harninkontinenz[2016/12]
English:Use of myoblasts in the manufacture of a medicament for treating stress urinary incontinence[2016/12]
French:Utilisation de myoblastes dans la fabrication d'un médicament pour traiter l'incontinence urinaire due au stress[2016/12]
Former [2009/27]Verwendung von Myoblasten bei der Herstellung eines Arzneimittels zur Behandlung von stressbedingter Harninkontinenz
Former [2009/27]Use of myoblasts in the manufacture of a medicament for treating stress urinary incontinence
Former [2009/27]Utilisation de myoblastes dans la fabrication d'un médicament pour traiter l'incontinence urinaire due au stress
Examination procedure31.03.2009Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1}
05.01.2010Examination requested  [2010/07]
12.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.05.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.08.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.08.2012Observations by third parties
20.12.2012Fee for grant paid
20.12.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05000057.9  / EP1604674
EP99920202.1  / EP1113807
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990920202) is  29.09.2005
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.11.2013  25.11.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Innovacell Biotechnologie AG
Mitterweg 24
6020 Innsbruck / AT
Opponent's representative
Drexl, Janna
Dehmel & Bettenhausen
Patentanwälte PartmbB
Herzogspitalstraße 11
80331 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/01]
Opponent(s)01  12.11.2013  25.11.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Innovacell Biotechnologie AG
Mitterweg 24
6020 Innsbruck / AT
Opponent's representative
Drexl, Janna
Dehmel & Bettenhausen
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Herzogspitalstraße 11
80331 München / DE
19.12.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.04.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.09.2015Date of oral proceedings
03.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
03.11.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
02.03.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition29.04.2016Appeal received No.  T1031/16
12.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
29.04.2016Appeal received No.  T1031/16
01.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
24.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application was refused due to failure to designate an inventor
05.05.2009Request for further processing filed
05.05.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.05.2009Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
18.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
18.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
18.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
18.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
18.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
18.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
18.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
29.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
26.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
25.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
25.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI13.02.2013
MC13.02.2013
NL13.02.2013
SE13.02.2013
CH30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
LU30.04.2013
GR14.05.2013
PT13.06.2013
GB29.04.2019
IE30.04.2019
[2019/47]
Former [2019/33]FI13.02.2013
MC13.02.2013
NL13.02.2013
SE13.02.2013
CH30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
LU30.04.2013
GR14.05.2013
PT13.06.2013
IE30.04.2019
Former [2015/34]FI13.02.2013
MC13.02.2013
NL13.02.2013
SE13.02.2013
CH30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
LU30.04.2013
GR14.05.2013
PT13.06.2013
Former [2014/08]FI13.02.2013
MC13.02.2013
NL13.02.2013
SE13.02.2013
CH30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
GR14.05.2013
PT13.06.2013
Former [2014/01]FI13.02.2013
MC13.02.2013
NL13.02.2013
SE13.02.2013
GR14.05.2013
PT13.06.2013
Former [2013/48]FI13.02.2013
NL13.02.2013
SE13.02.2013
GR14.05.2013
PT13.06.2013
Former [2013/40]FI13.02.2013
SE13.02.2013
GR14.05.2013
PT13.06.2013
Former [2013/37]FI13.02.2013
SE13.02.2013
GR14.05.2013
Former [2013/34]SE13.02.2013
Documents cited:Search[A]US5130141  (LAW PETER K [US], et al) [A] * column 2, line 57 - line 61 * * column 7, line 39 - column 10, line 48 *;
 [A]  - ELIA G ET AL, "Genuine stress urinary incontinence with low urethral pressure: Five-year follow-up after the Ball-Burch procedure", EMBASE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1995), Database accession no. EMB-1995233867, XP002349530 [A] * abstract *
    [ ] - JOURNAL OF REPRODUCTIVE MEDICINE FOR THE OBSTETRICIAN AND GYNECOLOGIST 1995 UNITED STATES, (1995), vol. 40, no. 7, ISSN 0024-7758, pages 503 - 506
 [A]  - MURRY C E ET AL, "Skeletal myoblast transplantation for repair of myocardial necrosis", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, US, (19961201), vol. 98, no. 11, ISSN 0021-9738, pages 2512 - 2523, XP002078686 [A] * page 2512, column R, paragraph 1 * * page 2513, column L, paragraphs 1,2 * * page 2514, column L, paragraph 2 - page 2516, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 2516, column R, paragraph 1 - page 2517, paragraph 1 * * page 2520, column R, paragraph 1 * * page 2521, column R, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI119070
 [PX]  - TIRNEY SEAN ET AL, "Myoblast periurethral injection for the treatment of stress urinary incontinence", JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, & 93RD ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN UROLOGICAL ASSOCIATION, INC.; SAN DIEGO, CALIFORNIA, USA; MAY 30-JUNE 4, 1998, (199805), vol. 159, no. 5 SUPPL., ISSN 0022-5347, page 327, XP008054125 [PX] 1-8 * abstract *
 [PX]  - SOMOGYI GEORGE ET AL, "A precise, localized bladder injury model to investigate the effect of myoblast injection on bladder contractility", JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, & 94TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN UROLOGICAL ASSOCIATION, INC.; DALLAS, TEXAS, USA; MAY 1-6, 1999, (199904), vol. 161, no. 4 SUPPL., ISSN 0022-5347, page 43, XP008054141 [PX] 1-8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00005392-199904010-00176
 [PX]  - YOKOYAMA TERUHIKO ET AL, "Primary myoblasts injection into the urethra and bladder as a potential treatment of stress urinary incontinence and impaired detrusor contractility: Long-term survival without significant cytotoxicity", JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, & 94TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN UROLOGICAL ASSOCIATION, INC.; DALLAS, TEXAS, USA; MAY 1-6, 1999, (199904), vol. 161, no. 4 SUPPL., ISSN 0022-5347, page 307, XP008054158 [PX] 1-8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00005392-199904020-00231
 [PX]  - HUARD JOHNNY ET AL, "Differentiation of primary myoblast injection into the lower urinary tract: Creation of detrusor cellular myoplasty", JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, & 94TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN UROLOGICAL ASSOCIATION, INC.; DALLAS, TEXAS, USA; MAY 1-6, 1999, (199904), vol. 161, no. 4 SUPPL., ISSN 0022-5347, page 66, XP008054160 [PX] 1-8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00005392-199904010-00266
 [PX]  - HUARD JOHNNY ET AL, "Myoblast injection into the bladder wall: A possible method of modulating detrusor contractility and cell-mediated gene therapy for bladder dysfunction", JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, & 93RD ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN UROLOGICAL ASSOCIATION, INC.; SAN DIEGO, CALIFORNIA, USA; MAY 30-JUNE 4, 1998, (199805), vol. 159, no. 5 SUPPL., ISSN 0022-5347, page 16, XP002120829 [PX] 1-8 * abstract *
 [PX]  - YOKOYAMA TERUHIKO ET AL, "Gene therapy as a potential treatment for BPH: Injection of myoblast-adenovirus transfected with human inducible nitric oxide synthase (iNOS) into the proximal urethra", JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, & 94TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN UROLOGICAL ASSOCIATION, INC.; DALLAS, TEXAS, USA; MAY 1-6, 1999, (199904), vol. 161, no. 4 SUPPL., ISSN 0022-5347, page 305, XP002120830 [PX] 1-8 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00005392-199904020-00224
Examination   - EXPERIMENTAL PHYSIOLOGY, (1999), vol. 84, pages 215 - 221
by applicantUS5130141
 US5538722
 US5658565
 US5468630
    - G. BANDARA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, no. 22, pages 10764 - 10768
    - C.H. EVANS; P.D. ROBBINS, ANN. MED., (1995), vol. 27, no. 5, pages 543 - 546
    - C.H. EVANS; P.D. ROBBINS, J. RHEUM., (1994), vol. 21, no. 5, pages 779 - 782
    - T.A. RANDO ET AL., J. CELL BIOL., (1994), vol. 125, pages 1275 - 1287
    - Z. QU ET AL., J. CELL BIOL., (1998), vol. 142, no. 5, pages 1257 - 1267
    - T HURME ET AL., MED. SCI. SPORTS EXERC., (1991), vol. 23, pages 801 - 810
    - T HURME ET AL., MED. SCI. SPORTS EXERC., (1992), vol. 24, pages 197 - 205
    - W.E. GARRETT ET AL., J. HAND SURGERY (AM, (1984), vol. 9A, pages 683 - 692
    - W.E. GARRETT ET AL., MED. SCI. SPORTS EXERC., (1990), vol. 22, pages 436 - 443
    - T HURME, MED. SCI. SPORTS EXERC., (1992), vol. 24, pages 197 - 205
    - "The satellite cell and muscle regeneration", R. BISCHOFF, Myology, MCGRAW-HILL, INC, (1994), pages 97 - 118
    - H.S. ALLAMEDINE ET AL., MUSCLE NERVE, (1989), vol. 12, pages 544 - 555
    - E. SCHULTZ ET AL., MUSCLE NERVE, (1985), vol. 8, page 217
    - E. SCHULTZ, MED. SCI. SPORTS EXERC., (1989), vol. 21, page 181
    - GARRETT ET AL., MED. SCI. SPORTS EXERC., (1990), vol. 22, pages 436 - 443
    - E.A. WANG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 2220 - 2224
    - J. FANG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 5753 - 5758
    - I. NITA ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM, (1996), vol. 39, pages 820 - 828
    - G. BANDARA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 10764 - 10768
    - C.S. DAY, J. ORTHOP. RES., (1997), vol. 15, pages 227 - 234
    - S.P. ARNOSCZKY ET AL., AM. J. SPORTS MED., (1982), vol. 10, pages 90 - 95
    - N.A. CONTI ET AL., TRANS ORTHOP. RES. SOC., (1993), vol. 18, page 60
    - K.P. SPINDLER ET AL., J. ORTHOP. RES., (1995), vol. 13, no. 2, pages 201 - 207
    - J. G. BLAIVAS, UROL. CLIN. N. AMER., (1985), vol. 12, pages 215 - 224
    - D.R. STASKIN, UROL. CLIN. N. AMER., (1985), vol. 12, pages 271 - 278
    - P. ABRAMS ET AL., NEUROL. & URODYNAM, (1987), vol. 7, pages 403 - 427
    - E.J. MCGUIRE, J. UROL, (1981), vol. 126, pages 205 - 209
    - N.M. RESNICK ET AL., NEW ENGL. J. MED., (1989), vol. 320, pages 1 - 7
    - A. WEIN ET AL., J. UROL., (1980), vol. 123, page 302
    - M.B. CHANCELLOR, Evaluation and Outcome. In: The Health of Women With Physical Disabilities: Setting a Research Agenda forthe 90's, BROOKS PUBLISHING COMPANY, (1996), pages 309 - 332
    - TA. PARTRIDGE; K.E. DAVIES, BRIT. MED. BULLETIN, (1995), vol. 51, pages 123 - 137
    - J. DHAWAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 254, pages 1509 - 1512
    - A.D. GRINNELL, Myology, MCGRAW-HILL, INC, (1994), pages 303 - 304
    - S. JIAO; J.A. WOLFF, BRAIN RESEARCH, (1992), vol. 575, pages 143 - 147
    - H. VANDENBURGH, HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1996), vol. 7, pages 2195 - 2200
    - E. GUSSONI ET AL., NATURE, (1992), vol. 356, pages 435 - 438
    - J. HUARD ET AL., MUSCLE & NERVE, (1992), vol. 15, pages 550 - 560
    - G. KARPATI ET AL., ANN. NEUROL., (1993), vol. 34, pages 8 - 17
    - J.P. TREMBLAY ET AL., CELL TRANSPLANTATION, (1993), vol. 2, pages 99 - 112
    - C.M. LYNCH ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 1138 - 1142
    - G.D. SIMONSON ET AL., HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1996), vol. 7, pages 71 - 78
    - S. JIA ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 362, page 450
    - Y. DAI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1995), vol. 89, page 10892
    - S.W. ROBINSON ET AL., CELL TRANSPLANTATION, (1995), vol. 5, pages 77 - 91
    - C.E. MURRY ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1996), vol. 98, pages 2512 - 2523
    - S. GOJO ET AL., CELL TRANSPLANTATION, (1996), vol. 5, pages 581 - 584
    - A. ZIBAITIS ET AL., TRANSPLANTATION PROCEEDINGS, (1994), vol. 26, page 3294
    - M.A. WHEELER ET AL., J. UROL, (1997), vol. 158, no. 6, pages 2045 - 2050
    - S.D. SMITH ET AL., J. UROL., (1997), vol. 158, no. 3, pages 703 - 708
    - M.A. WHEELER ET AL., J. UROL., (1997), vol. 158, no. 6, pages 2045 - 2050
    - H. KAKIZAKI ET AL., AM. J. PHYS., (1997), vol. 272, pages R1647 - 1656
    - A.L. BUMETT, UROLOGY, (1995), vol. 45, pages 1071 - 1083
    - M. TAKEDA ET AL., UROLOGY, (1995), vol. 45, pages 440 - 446
    - W. BLOCH ET AL., PROSTATE, (1997), vol. 33, pages 1 - 8
    - G. ACSADI ET AL., HUMAN MOL. GENETICS, (1994), vol. 3, no. 4, pages 579 - 584
    - PRICE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1987), vol. 84, page 156
    - SANES ET AL., EMBO J., (1986), vol. 5, page 3133
    - T.A. RANDO; H.M. BLAU, J. CELL. BIOL., (1994), vol. 125, pages 1275 - 1287
    - M.D. CHANCELLOR ET AL., J. UROL., (1994), vol. 151, pages 250 - 254
    - T WATANABE ET AL., J. UROL., (1996), vol. 156, pages 1507 - 1510
    - H. KAKIZAKI, AM. J. PHYSIOL., (1997), vol. 272, pages R1647 - 1656
    - B. UVELIUS; A. MATTIASSON, J. UROL., (1984), vol. 132, pages 587 - 590
    - W.D. STEERS ET AL., J. UROL., (1991), vol. 155, pages 379 - 385
    - T. A. RANDO ET AL., J. CELL BIOL., (1994), vol. 125, pages 1275 - 1287
    - Z. QU ET AL., J. CELL BIOL, (1998), vol. 142, pages 1257 - 1267
    - J.E. MORGAN ET AL., DEVELOP. BIOL., (1994), vol. 162, pages 486 - 498
    - D.A. GELLERET, "Molecular cloning and expression of inducible nitric oxide synthase from human hepatocytes", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.90.8.3491, pages 3491 - 3495, XP002035065

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.90.8.3491
    - E. TZENG, "Adenoviral transfer of the inducible nitric oxide synthase gene blocks endothelial cell apoptosis", SURGERY, (1997), vol. 122, no. 2, pages 255 - 263
    - E. TZENG ET AL., ""Gene Therapy" (Review", CURRENT PROBLEMS IN SURGERY, (1996), vol. 33, no. 12, pages 961 - 1041
    - G. ASCADI ET AL., HUMAN MOL. GENETICS, (1994), vol. 3, no. 4, pages 579 - 584
    - S. KOCHANEK ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 5731 - 5736
    - D.A. GELLER ET AL., PROC. NAIL ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 3491 - 3495
    - PRICE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 156 - 160
    - E. TZENG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1995), vol. 92, pages 11771 - 11775
    - E. TZENG ET AL., SURGERY, (1996), vol. 120, pages 315 - 321
    - J. HUARD ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1994), vol. 93, pages 586 - 599
    - J. HUARD ET AL., MUSCLE & NERVE, (1994), vol. 17, pages 224 - 234
    - J. HUARD ET AL., GENE THERAPY, (1995), vol. 2, pages 107 - 115
    - L.C. GREEN ET AL., J. ANALYT. BIOCHEM., (1982), vol. 126, pages 131 - 138
    - L.J. IGNARRO ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN, (1987), vol. 170, pages 843 - 850
    - A.L. BURNETT, UROLOGY, (1995), vol. 45, pages 1071 - 1083
    - D.S. BREDT; S.H. SNYDER, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 682 - 685
    - P. CHOMCZYNSKI; N. SACCHI, ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1987), vol. 162, pages 156 - 159
    - D. A. GELLER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 522 - 526
    - D.A. GELLER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 3491 - 3495
    - E. S. KAWASAKI, PCR Protocols: a guide to methods and applications, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1990), pages 22 - 27
    - E. TZENG, MOL. MED, (1996), vol. 2, no. 2, pages 211 - 225
    - D. A. GELLER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 3491 - 3495
    - E. TZENG ET AL., MOI. MED., (1996), vol. 2, no. 2, pages 211 - 225
    - D. A. GELLER ET AL., PROC. NATL ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 3491 - 3495
    - E.S. KAWASAKI, Amplification of RNA. PCR Protocols: A guide to methods and applications, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1990), pages 22 - 27
    - S. HARDY ET AL., J. VIROL., (1997), vol. 71, pages 1842 - 1849
    - J. BRAUKER ET AL., HUMAN GENE THER., (1998), vol. 9, pages 879 - 888
    - M.B. CHANCELLOR ET AL., J. UROL., (1994), vol. 151, pages 250 - 254
    - H. KAKIZAKI ET AL., AM. J. PHY., (1997), vol. 272, pages R1647 - 1656
    - A. SATOH ET AL., J. HISTOCHEM. CYTOCHEM., (1993), vol. 41, no. 3, 4, pages 1579 - 1582
    - S. FLOYD ET AL., BASICAPPL. MYOL., (1997), vol. 7
    - J.A. WOLFF ET AL., SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 247, pages 1465 - 1468
    - S. JIAO ET AL., HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1992), vol. 3, pages 21 - 33
    - J. HUARD ET AL., HUMAN GENE THER., (1994), vol. 5, pages 949 - 958
    - D.J. ROSENBLATT ET AL., IN VITRO DEV. BIOL., (1995), vol. 31, pages 773 - 779
    - W.G. FEERO ET AL., GENE THER., (1997), vol. 4, pages 371 - 380
    - J.E. MORGAN ET AL., DEVELOP. BIOLOGY, (1994), vol. 162, pages 486 - 498
    - H. UENO ET AL., ARTERIOSCLEROSIS, THROMBOSIS & VASCULAR BIOLOGY, (1997), vol. 17, no. 11, pages 2453 - 60
    - J. C. TAKAHASHI ET AL., ATHEROSCLEROSIS, (1997), vol. 132, no. 2, pages 199 - 205
    - P. CUEVAS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 11196 - 12001
    - Y. NAKAHARA ET AL., CELL TRANSPL., (1996), vol. 5, pages 191 - 204
    - E. TZENG ET AL., I. SURGERY, (1996), vol. 120, pages 315 - 321
    - D.K NAKAYAMA ET AL., AM. J. RESPIR. CELL. MOL BIOL., (1992), vol. 7, pages 471 - 476
    - D.A. GELLER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 3491 - 3495
    - E. SCHULTZ, MED. SCI. SPORTS EXER., (1989), vol. 21, page 181
    - T. HURME; H. KALIMO, MED. SCI. SPORTS EXER., (1992), vol. 24, pages 197 - 205
    - R.L. CHAMBERS; J.C. MCDERMOTT, CAN. J. APPL. PHYSIOL., (1996), vol. 21, pages 155 - 184
    - J.R. FLORINI; K. MAGRI, AM. J. PHYSIOL., (1989), vol. 256, pages 701 - 711
    - M.D. GROUND, PATH. RES. PRACT., (1991), vol. 187, pages 1 - 22
    - J. HUARD ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST, (1994), vol. 93, pages 586 - 599
    - S. FLOYD ET AL., BASIC APPL MYOL., (1997), vol. 7, no. 3, 4
    - H.I. GEORGESCU ET AL., IN VITRO CELL. DEV. BIOL., (1988), vol. 24, pages 1015 - 1022
    - J. HUARD ET AL., HUMAN GENE THER., (1997), vol. 4, pages 439 - 450
    - J. HUARD ET AL., GENE THERAPY, (1995), vol. 2, pages 1 - 9
    - D.K. BOOTH II, J. TISSUE ENG., (1997), vol. 32, pages 125 - 132
    - A. SATOH ET AL., J. HISTOCHEM. CYTOCHEM., (1993), vol. 41, pages 1579 - 1582
    - DAY ET AL., J. ORTHOP. RES., (1997), vol. 15, pages 894 - 903
    - J.E. MORGAN ET AL., DEV. BIOL., (1994), vol. 162, pages 486 - 498
    - C.S. DAY ET AL., J. ORTHOP. RES., (1997), vol. 15, pages 894 - 903
    - A.I. CAPLAN, J.ORTHOP. RES., (1991), vol. 9, pages 641 - 650
    - A. YAMAGUCHI ET AL., J. CELL BIOL., (1991), vol. 113, pages 681 - 687
    - T. KATAGIRI ET AL., J. CELL BIOL., (1994), vol. 127, pages 1755 - 1766
    - K. KAWASAKI ET AL., BONE, (1998), vol. 23, pages 223 - 231