Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2083261

EP2083261 - Device for recording and recognising objects [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.03.2015
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.12.2018Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Binder & Co. Aktiengesellschaft
Postfach 294
8200 Gleisdorf / AT
[2009/31]
Inventor(s)01 / Huber, Reinhold
Belvederestrasse 2
8280 Fürstenfeld / AT
 [2015/15]
Former [2009/31]01 / Huber, Reinhold
Belvederestrasse 2
8280, Fürstenfeld / AT
Representative(s)KLIMENT & HENHAPEL
Patentanwälte OG
Gonzagagasse 15/2
1010 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [2015/15]Kliment, Peter
Kliment & Henhapel
Patentanwälte OG
Singerstraße 8
A-1010 Wien / AT
Former [2009/31]Kliment, Peter
Kliment & Henhapel Patentanwälte OG Singerstraße 8
A-1010 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date08170085.827.11.2008
[2009/31]
Priority number, dateAT20080000047U24.01.2008         Original published format: AT 4708 U
[2013/10]
Former [2009/31]AT20080000047U24.01.2008
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2083261
Date:29.07.2009
Language:DE
[2009/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2083261
Date:17.02.2010
[2010/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2083261
Date:08.04.2015
Language:DE
[2015/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.2010
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/89, G01N21/85
[2014/50]
Former International [2009/31]G01N21/89
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/31]
Extension statesAL17.08.2010
BA17.08.2010
MK17.08.2010
RS17.08.2010
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Erfassen und Erkennen von Objekten[2009/31]
English:Device for recording and recognising objects[2009/31]
French:Dispositif de détermination et de reconnaissance d'objets[2009/31]
Examination procedure12.05.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.05.2010Examination requested  [2010/27]
13.11.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.12.2014Observations by third parties
25.02.2015Fee for grant paid
25.02.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.02.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.11.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.12.2015   
BT-Wolfgang Binder GmbH
Mühlwaldstrasse 21
8200 Gleisdorf / AT
Opponent's representative
Gibler & Poth Patentanwälte KG
Dorotheergasse 7/14
1010 Wien / AT
 [2016/04]
16.02.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
16.06.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.09.2017Date of oral proceedings
23.11.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
23.11.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition22.01.2018Appeal received No.  T0281/18
21.03.2018Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
02.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
01.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.11.2008
BG08.04.2015
CY08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MT08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
IE27.11.2015
LU27.11.2015
[2017/39]
Former [2016/45]CZ08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
IE27.11.2015
LU27.11.2015
Former [2016/31]CZ08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
LU27.11.2015
Former [2016/28]CZ08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
Former [2016/24]CZ08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
Former [2016/10]CZ08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
Former [2016/09]EE08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
Former [2015/50]FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
Former [2015/49]FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
GR09.07.2015
Documents cited:Search[YD]EP1205745  (BINDER CO AG [AT]) [YD] 1-12 * abstract * * column 3 *;
 [Y]US5414489  (KAPLAN MARTIN C [US]) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * column 1 * * column 3 *;
 [A]US5479009  (JABLONSKI JOSEPH W [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [A]US6796697  (BRAGG CHRIS [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract *
by applicantUS5355084
 EP1205745
otherUS6200002
 US5414489
 EP1205745